EP1433466 - Hair cleansing composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 21.03.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2014 | Change - rejection of opposition | published on 23.04.2014 [2014/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAO CORPORATION 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayaba-cho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | [2011/06] |
Former [2004/27] | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi-Kayabacho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakai, Hirokazu Kao Corp. Research Laboratories 1-3 Bunka 2-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | 02 /
Tanamachi, Hiroto Kao Corp. Research Laboratories 1-3 Bunka 2-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | 03 /
Okamoto, Yoshimasa Kao Corp. Research Laboratories 1-3 Bunka 2-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | [2004/27] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03029670.1 | 23.12.2003 | [2004/27] | Priority number, date | JP20020375319 | 25.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002375319 | [2004/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1433466 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1433466 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | [2005/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1433466 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/42, A61Q5/02 | [2010/34] | CPC: |
A61K8/42 (EP,US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/27] | A61K7/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/43] |
Former [2004/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Haarwaschmittel | [2004/27] | English: | Hair cleansing composition | [2004/27] | French: | Composition pour nettoyer les cheveux | [2004/27] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 09.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.11.2011
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2011/51] | 16.02.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.06.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 01.10.2012 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2014/16] | 27.09.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.10.2013 | 21.10.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.11.2013 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 01.12.2013 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2014/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0739625 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1-3,5-9 * page 12, lines 5-10; example -; claim - * * page 9, line 57 - page 11, line 17 * * page 11, lines 28,29 *; | [X]US5661118 (CAUWET DANIELE [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,5-9 * column 14, lines 21-26; example -; claim - * * column 10, line 25 - column 12, line 58 * * column 13, lines 8,9 *; | [X]EP1166766 (KAO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-9 * paragraphs [0013] , [0023] , [0024] , [0046]; example 3 *; | [A] - K. DE POLO, A short Textbook of Cosmetology, AUGSBURG,GERMANY, VERLAG FÜR CHEMISCHE INDUSTRIE, (1998), XP002295514 [A] 1-9 * pages 65-69 * | by applicant | US5393519 | JPH0859443 | EP0739625 | US5661118 | EP1166766 |