EP1548021 - One-part self-etching, self-priming dental adhesive composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENTSPLY DETREY GmbH DeTrey Strasse 1 78467 Konstanz / DE | [2007/12] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states DENTSPLY DETREY GmbH DeTrey Strasse 1 78467 Konstanz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klee, Joachim E. Espelweg 3/4 78315 Konstanz / DE | 02 /
Lehmann, Uwe Max-Strohmeyer-Strasse 1 78467 Konstanz / DE | 03 /
Walz, Uwe Zum Klausenhorn 9 78467 Konstanz / DE | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/26] | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz, Patentanwälte, Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03029824.4 | 23.12.2003 | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1548021 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1548021 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/09, C08F30/02, A61K6/00, A61K6/083 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
C07F9/091 (EP,US);
A61K6/30 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/30, C08L33/00 (EP,US);
A61K6/30, C08L43/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/26] | Title | German: | In einem selbstätzendes, selbstgrundierendes dentales Haftmittel | [2005/26] | English: | One-part self-etching, self-priming dental adhesive composition | [2005/26] | French: | Composition d'adhésif dentaire en une partie d'auto-gravure et d'auto-mordenage | [2005/26] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/08] | 22.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.03.2007 | BE | 21.03.2007 | CH | 21.03.2007 | CY | 21.03.2007 | CZ | 21.03.2007 | DK | 21.03.2007 | EE | 21.03.2007 | FI | 21.03.2007 | LI | 21.03.2007 | NL | 21.03.2007 | RO | 21.03.2007 | SI | 21.03.2007 | SK | 21.03.2007 | TR | 21.03.2007 | BG | 21.06.2007 | SE | 21.06.2007 | GR | 22.06.2007 | ES | 02.07.2007 | PT | 21.08.2007 | HU | 22.09.2007 | LU | 23.12.2007 | IE | 24.12.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
BE | 21.03.2007 | ||
CH | 21.03.2007 | ||
CY | 21.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
EE | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
LI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
BG | 21.06.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
GR | 22.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
LU | 23.12.2007 | ||
IE | 24.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
BE | 21.03.2007 | ||
CH | 21.03.2007 | ||
CY | 21.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
EE | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
LI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
GR | 22.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
IE | 24.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
BE | 21.03.2007 | ||
CH | 21.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
EE | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
LI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
GR | 22.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
IE | 24.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
BE | 21.03.2007 | ||
CH | 21.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
LI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
GR | 22.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
IE | 24.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
BE | 21.03.2007 | ||
CH | 21.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
LI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
GR | 22.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
BE | 21.03.2007 | ||
CH | 21.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
LI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
BE | 21.03.2007 | ||
CH | 21.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
LI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
BE | 21.03.2007 | ||
CH | 21.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
LI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
BE | 21.03.2007 | ||
CH | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
LI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
BE | 21.03.2007 | ||
CH | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
LI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 21.03.2007 | |
CH | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
LI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | ||
ES | 02.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | CH | 21.03.2007 | |
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
LI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SE | 21.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0010478 (BIOMAT SERVICES INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-22 * examples 1-6 *; | [A]EP1148060 (IVOCLAR VIVADENT AG [LI]) [A] 1-23 * pages 9-11 * * examples 1,3 * * claim - *; | [DA]EP1169996 (MUEHLBAUER ERNST KG [DE]) [DA] 1-23* claim - *; | [Y]WO03013444 (DENTSPLY INT INC [US]) [Y] 1-22 * claim - *; | [A]WO03035013 (DENTSPLY DETREY GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-23 * claim - * | Examination | WO2004078100 |