EP1435414 - Sanitary support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hansgrohe SE Auestraße 5-9 77761 Schiltach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | For all designated states Hansgrohe SE Auestrasse 5-9 77761 Schiltach / DE | ||
Former [2004/28] | For all designated states Hansgrohe AG Auestrasse 5 - 9 77761 Schiltach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gross, Jürgen Dochbach 15 77790 Steinach / DE | [2004/28] | Representative(s) | Schöndorf, Jürgen Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2013/35] |
Former [2004/28] | Schöndorf, Jürgen Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner, Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 03029836.8 | 24.12.2003 | [2004/28] | Priority number, date | DE20031000536 | 03.01.2003 Original published format: DE 10300536 | [2004/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1435414 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1435414 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | [2005/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1435414 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/06 | [2004/28] | CPC: |
E03C1/0408 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/28] | Title | German: | Sanitärhalterung | [2004/28] | English: | Sanitary support | [2004/28] | French: | Support sanitaire | [2004/28] | Examination procedure | 13.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 07.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2006 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.12.2003 | BG | 28.08.2013 | CY | 28.08.2013 | CZ | 28.08.2013 | DK | 28.08.2013 | EE | 28.08.2013 | ES | 28.08.2013 | FI | 28.08.2013 | IT | 28.08.2013 | MC | 28.08.2013 | NL | 28.08.2013 | RO | 28.08.2013 | SE | 28.08.2013 | SI | 28.08.2013 | SK | 28.08.2013 | TR | 28.08.2013 | GR | 29.11.2013 | AT | 24.12.2013 | GB | 24.12.2013 | IE | 24.12.2013 | LU | 24.12.2013 | PT | 30.12.2013 | BE | 31.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | FR | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
TR | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
AT | 24.12.2013 | ||
GB | 24.12.2013 | ||
IE | 24.12.2013 | ||
LU | 24.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/25] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
AT | 24.12.2013 | ||
GB | 24.12.2013 | ||
IE | 24.12.2013 | ||
LU | 24.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/51] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
GB | 24.12.2013 | ||
IE | 24.12.2013 | ||
LU | 24.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IE | 24.12.2013 | ||
LU | 24.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/46] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
LU | 24.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
LU | 24.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | SE | 28.08.2013 | |
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | PT | 30.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1222446 (BRADLEY WASHFOUNTAIN COMPANY) [X] 1,6 * column 4, lines 17-43 * * figure 2 *; | [X]US4654900 (MCGHEE CHARLES M [US]) [X] 1-4,6-11 * column 2, lines 48-55 * * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 30 * * figures 1-8 *; | [A]US5321860 (STEINHARDT MICHAEL D [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, lines 15-49 ** figures 11-13 * | by applicant | US5321860 | EP0607981 | DE20023104U |