EP1515086 - Self-illuminating fabricated solid material objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.12.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pipo, Walter, E. 1433 Boies Road East Aurora New York 14052 / US | For all designated states Seely, Daniel 4360 Seneca Street West Seneca New York 14224 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/11] | For all designated states Pipo, Walter, E. 1433 Boies Road East Aurora, New York 14052 / US | ||
For all designated states Seely, Daniel 4360 Seneca Street West Seneca, New York 14224 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/11] | Representative(s) | Reichert, Werner Franz, et al Reichert & Kollegen Bismarckplatz 8 93047 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/38] | Reichert, Werner Franz, et al Reichert Patents & Trademarks Kumpfmühlerstrasse 3 93047 Regensburg / DE | ||
Former [2005/11] | Reichert, Werner F. Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Franz-Groedel-Strasse 1 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 03029873.1 | 27.12.2003 | [2005/11] | Priority number, date | US20030661420 | 13.09.2003 Original published format: US 661420 | US20030736468 | 14.12.2003 Original published format: US 736468 | [2005/28] |
Former [2005/11] | US20030661420 | 13.09.2003 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1515086 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1515086 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | [2008/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F21V33/00, G09F19/22, F21V8/00, E01C17/00 | [2005/11] | CPC: |
B28B23/0037 (EP);
G09F19/226 (EP,US);
E01C17/00 (EP);
F21V33/006 (EP);
G02B6/0008 (EP);
G02B6/4298 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Selbstleuchtende Gegenstände aus einem festen Material | [2005/11] | English: | Self-illuminating fabricated solid material objects | [2005/11] | French: | Articles autoéclairés en matière solide | [2005/11] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/03] | 11.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH08333729 (DAINICHI SHIZAI KK, et al) [Y] 10-12 * abstract * * figures 1,3 *; | [X]US6082886 (STANFORD MICHAEL S [US]) [X] 1-10,18-20 * column 6, lines 47-49 * * column 5, lines 57-64 * * figures 1,3 *; | [Y]DE29522298U (RINN BETON UND NATURSTEIN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 16 * abstract ** figure 3 *; | [XY]GB2380539 (METCALFE PAUL DAYAN [GB], et al) [X] 1-9,14,15,17-20 * page 2, lines 21-23 * * page 3, lines 16-22 * * figure 2 * [Y] 10-12,16 |