EP1435365 - Tertiary amino alkyl amide catalysts for improving the physical properties of polyurethane foams [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 23.12.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2011 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. 7201 Hamilton Boulevard Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US | [2004/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burdeniuc, Juan Jesus 2664 Barley Drive Macungie PA 18062 / US | [2004/28] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/28] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03029981.2 | 30.12.2003 | [2004/28] | Priority number, date | US20030336555 | 03.01.2003 Original published format: US 336555 | US20030336371 | 03.01.2003 Original published format: US 336371 | US20030338184 | 06.01.2003 Original published format: US 338184 | US20030724887 | 02.12.2003 Original published format: US 724887 | [2004/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1435365 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1435365 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | [2005/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1435365 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/18, C08G18/40, C08J9/00 | [2004/28] | CPC: |
C08G18/4072 (EP);
C08G18/1841 (EP);
C08G18/6564 (EP);
C08G2110/0008 (EP);
C08G2110/0083 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/28] | Title | German: | Verwendung von tertiären Aminoalkylamidkatalysatoren zur Verbesserung der physischen Eigenschaften von Polyurethanschäumen | [2004/28] | English: | Tertiary amino alkyl amide catalysts for improving the physical properties of polyurethane foams | [2004/28] | French: | Utilisation de catalyseurs contenant des groupes d'amine tertiaire et d'amide pour améliorer les propriétés physiques des mousses de polyuréthane | [2004/28] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 15.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.02.2008
23.04.2008
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.02.2008
BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02.05.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 07.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 17.09.2011 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2012/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.06.2007 | BE | 13.06.2007 | CH | 13.06.2007 | CY | 13.06.2007 | CZ | 13.06.2007 | DK | 13.06.2007 | EE | 13.06.2007 | FI | 13.06.2007 | LI | 13.06.2007 | NL | 13.06.2007 | RO | 13.06.2007 | SI | 13.06.2007 | SK | 13.06.2007 | TR | 13.06.2007 | BG | 13.09.2007 | SE | 13.09.2007 | GR | 14.09.2007 | ES | 24.09.2007 | PT | 13.11.2007 | HU | 14.12.2007 | LU | 30.12.2007 | IE | 31.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | GB | 30.12.2009 | IT | 30.12.2009 | FR | 31.12.2009 | DE | 01.07.2010 | [2011/14] |
Former [2011/05] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CY | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
TR | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
HU | 14.12.2007 | ||
LU | 30.12.2007 | ||
IE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
GB | 30.12.2009 | ||
FR | 31.12.2009 | ||
DE | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CY | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
TR | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
HU | 14.12.2007 | ||
LU | 30.12.2007 | ||
IE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
FR | 31.12.2009 | ||
DE | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CY | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
TR | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
HU | 14.12.2007 | ||
LU | 30.12.2007 | ||
IE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
FR | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CY | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
TR | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
HU | 14.12.2007 | ||
LU | 30.12.2007 | ||
IE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/38] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CY | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
LU | 30.12.2007 | ||
IE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CY | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
IE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
IE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
IE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
IE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/33] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | CH | 13.06.2007 | |
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4735970 (SOMMERFELD CLAUS-DIETER [DE], et al) [DA] 1-23* column 11, line 45 - line 46; example 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0579080 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-23 * page 2, line 8 - line 33 * * page 3, line 54 - page 4, line 52; example - * * page 6, line 5 - line 20; claims 1-5 *; | [A]EP0730619 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-23 * page 2, line 38 - line 54 * * page 4, line 30; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0877042 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [A] 1-23 * page 2, line 55 - page 3, line 17 * * page 4, line 18 - page 6, line 8; claims 1-16 *; | [A]WO02098940 (HUNTSMAN SPEC CHEM CORP [US]) [A] 1-23 * page 2, line 1 - page 7, line 16; claim 1 * |