EP1435701 - Passive optical network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-city Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/28] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-city, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jung, Dae-Kwang, c/o Samsung Elec. Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kang, Byung-Chang, c/o Samsung Elec. Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Oh, Yun-Je, c/o Samsung Elec. Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Park, Tae-Sung, c/o Samsung Elec. Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2004/28] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/28] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03030014.9 | 30.12.2003 | [2004/28] | Priority number, date | KR20030000135 | 02.01.2003 Original published format: KR 2003000135 | [2004/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1435701 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1435701 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/207, H04J14/02, H04B10/17 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
H04B10/27 (EP,US);
H04B10/25 (KR);
H04B10/272 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/28] | H04B10/207 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/12] |
Former [2004/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Passives optisches Netzwerk | [2004/28] | English: | Passive optical network | [2004/28] | French: | Réseau optique passif | [2004/28] | Examination procedure | 30.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 17.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/03] | 02.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0865173 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-18 * column 20, line 19 - column 21, line 33; figures 8a,26 *; | [A]US2002093709 (KIM JIN-HAN [KR], et al) [A] 1-18* page 2, paragraph 25 - page 3, paragraph 34; figures 2,4 *; | [A]EP1227606 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-18 * figures 1,10 *; | [Y]EP1235433 (MARCONI COMM INC [US]) [Y] 1-18 * column 9, paragraph 24 - page 1, column 14, paragraph 50; figure 1 * |