EP1304085 - Biodegradable tissue marking device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Devicor Medical Products, Inc. 300 E Business Way Fifth Floor Cincinnati, OH 45241 / US | [2013/33] |
Former [2011/08] | For all designated states Devicor Medical Products, Inc. 10505 Corporate Drive, Suite207 Pleasant Prairie, WI 53158 / US | ||
Former [2003/17] | For all designated states ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, INC. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Foerster, Seth A. 758 Via Otono San Clemente, CA 92672 / US | 02 /
Burbank, Fred H. 30982 Steeplechase Drive San Juan Capistrano, CA 92675 / US | 03 /
Ritchart, Mark A. 41045 Willowbend Drive Murrieta, CA 92563 / US | 04 /
Zerhouni, Elias A. 5 Rocklandvue Court Baltimore, MD 21204 / US | [2003/17] | Representative(s) | Curtis, Philip Anthony, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | Curtis, Philip Anthony, et al A.A. Thornton & Co., 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 03075084.8 | 12.09.1995 | [2003/17] | Priority number, date | US19940308097 | 16.09.1994 Original published format: US 308097 | [2003/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1304085 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1304085 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | [2004/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B19/00 | [2003/17] | CPC: |
A61B90/39 (EP,US);
A61B10/0275 (EP,US);
A61B10/0283 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00004 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3908 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3987 (EP,US);
Y10T24/4501 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/42] |
Former [2003/17] | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | Aus biologisch abbaubarem Material hergestellte Gewebemarkierungsvorrichtung | [2003/17] | English: | Biodegradable tissue marking device | [2003/17] | French: | Elément biodégradable de marquage de tissu | [2003/17] | Examination procedure | 25.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/22] | 06.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/51] | 14.12.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 05.11.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/51] | Appeal following examination | 24.02.2011 | Appeal received No. T1152/11 | 21.04.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.09.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95932486.4 / EP0781114 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19950932486) is 14.06.2000 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3194239 (SULLIVAN CORNELIUS J P) [A] 1,5 * column 2, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US4356572 (GUILLEMIN GENEVIEVE, et al) [X] 1-9 * example 2 *; | [X]US5085629 (GOLDBERG JAY [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,8 * abstract *; | [A]EP0481685 (COOK INC [US]) [A] 1 * figures 5-7 *; | [A]US5127916 (SPENCER STEPHEN F [US], et al); | [X]US5192300 (FOWLER BRADFORD C [US]) [X] 1-4,7 * column 5, line 61 - line 65; figures 8,9 *; | [X]US5195988 (HAAGA JOHN R [US]) [X] 1-4 * figures 1-3 *; | [X]US5433751 (CHRISTEL PASCAL [FR], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract * | by applicant | US4080959 | US4649151 | USRE34056E | US5147307 | US5192270 | US5221269 | US5240011 | US5526822 |