EP1441297 - Distributed lottery game [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.10.2005 [2005/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGF Netgame Factory AB Sveavägen 76 113 59 Stockholm / SE | [2004/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moberg, Klas Ovre Asbogatan 45 504 54 Boras / SE | [2004/31] | Representative(s) | Herbjo̸rnsen, Rut Zacco Sweden AB Valhallavägen 117 Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/31] | Herbjörnsen, Rut Albihns Stockholm AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 03075194.5 | 17.01.2003 | [2004/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1441297 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2004/31] | CPC: |
G07F17/32 (EP);
A63F3/0605 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/16] |
Former [2004/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verteiltes Lottospiel | [2004/31] | English: | Distributed lottery game | [2004/31] | French: | Jeu de loterie distribué | [2004/31] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/43] | 30.05.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.03.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.03.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6024641 (SARNO ROBERT A [US]) [X] 1-13 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 15; figure 1 * * column 5, line 30 - line 65 * * column 7, line 17 - line 32 * * column 10, line 29 - column 11, line 31; claims 1,7,14 *; | [X]WO0103789 (GTECH CORP [US]) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [X]US6277026 (ARCHER MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1-13 * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 19; figures 4C,4D,4E,5A,5B *; | [X]US6322446 (YACENDA MICHAEL W [US]) [X] 1-13* claims 1-5,10,17 *; | [X]US6454650 (ARONIN KEVIN J [US]) [X] 1-13 * claims 1,8,15,22 *; | [X]WO02093510 (GRUENDERENE STONEBRIDGE DA [NO], et al) [X] 1-13 * page 5 - page 6; figure 1 * * page 12, line 5 - line 11 * |