EP1316739 - Shaft phase control mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2005 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aimbridge Pty. Ltd. 9th Floor, 161 Collins Street Melbourne, VIC 3000 / AU | [2003/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Willmot, Eric Paul 169 Kingsford Smith Drive Melba, ACT 2615 / AU | [2003/23] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | Jenkins, Peter David, et al PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 03075668.8 | 28.11.1996 | [2003/23] | Priority number, date | AU1996PN08244 | 23.02.1996 Original published format: AU PN824496 | AU1996PO00627 | 25.06.1996 Original published format: AU PO062796 | [2003/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1316739 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1316739 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16D3/10, F16H35/00, B63H3/10 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
F16D3/10 (EP,US);
B23B31/26 (KR);
B23B31/28 (EP,US);
B63H5/10 (EP,US);
B64C11/32 (EP,US);
B64D31/12 (EP,US);
F01L1/352 (EP,US);
F03D15/00 (EP,US);
F03D15/10 (EP,US);
F03D7/0224 (EP,US);
F16H35/008 (EP,US);
F05B2260/4031 (EP,US);
F05B2260/40311 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19084 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/23] | Title | German: | System zur Regelung des Differenzwinkels einer Welle | [2003/23] | English: | Shaft phase control mechanism | [2003/23] | French: | Mécanisme de commande de phase d'arbres | [2003/23] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 07.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96938860.2 / EP0954401 | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.08.2004 | BE | 25.08.2004 | CH | 25.08.2004 | FI | 25.08.2004 | LI | 25.08.2004 | DK | 25.11.2004 | GR | 25.11.2004 | SE | 25.11.2004 | LU | 28.11.2004 | IE | 29.11.2004 | MC | 30.11.2004 | ES | 06.12.2004 | PT | 25.01.2005 | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/13] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
BE | 25.08.2004 | ||
CH | 25.08.2004 | ||
FI | 25.08.2004 | ||
LI | 25.08.2004 | ||
DK | 25.11.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
LU | 28.11.2004 | ||
IE | 29.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
ES | 06.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
BE | 25.08.2004 | ||
CH | 25.08.2004 | ||
FI | 25.08.2004 | ||
LI | 25.08.2004 | ||
DK | 25.11.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
IE | 29.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
ES | 06.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/48] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
BE | 25.08.2004 | ||
CH | 25.08.2004 | ||
FI | 25.08.2004 | ||
LI | 25.08.2004 | ||
DK | 25.11.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
ES | 06.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
BE | 25.08.2004 | ||
CH | 25.08.2004 | ||
FI | 25.08.2004 | ||
LI | 25.08.2004 | ||
DK | 25.11.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
ES | 06.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
CH | 25.08.2004 | ||
FI | 25.08.2004 | ||
LI | 25.08.2004 | ||
DK | 25.11.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
ES | 06.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
CH | 25.08.2004 | ||
FI | 25.08.2004 | ||
LI | 25.08.2004 | ||
DK | 25.11.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
CH | 25.08.2004 | ||
FI | 25.08.2004 | ||
LI | 25.08.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
FI | 25.08.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
FI | 25.08.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 25.08.2004 | |
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 25.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB531756 (JOHN STAFFORD NORTHCOTE) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 15 - line 31; figure 1 * [A] 3; | [A]EP0396280 (JAGUAR CARS [GB]); | [A]US5174716 (HORA PETR [US], et al) |