EP1346665 - Piece of furniture to sit on [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been limited Status updated on 24.12.2010 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: LU | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boschman, Frank Guyotdreef 20 2930 Brasschaat / BE | For all designated states Van Puyvelde, Kris Jan Simon Appelkantstraat 110 2530 Boechout / BE | [2003/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/39] | Representative(s) | Sarlet, Stephanie, et al Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/04] | Sarlet, Steven Renaat Irène, et al Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | ||
Former [2003/39] | Donné, Eddy, et al Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Antwerpen / BE | Application number, filing date | 03075789.2 | 18.03.2003 | [2003/39] | Priority number, date | BE20020000196 | 19.03.2002 Original published format: BE 200200196 | [2003/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1346665 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1346665 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Type: | B3 Limited patent | No.: | EP1346665 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A47C7/22, A47C31/02 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
A47C7/282 (EP);
A47C31/02 (EP);
A47C7/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/39] | Title | German: | Sitzmöbel | [2003/39] | English: | Piece of furniture to sit on | [2003/39] | French: | Meuble pour s'asseoir | [2005/44] |
Former [2003/39] | Meuble d'assise | Examination procedure | 16.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/12] | 07.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/43] | Limitations: | 30.09.2009 | Date of receipt of request for limitation | admissible | 13.10.2010 | Communication of intention to limit the patent | 30.11.2010 | Fee for printing patent specification after limitation | 10.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.11.2005 | CY | 16.11.2005 | CZ | 16.11.2005 | EE | 16.11.2005 | FI | 16.11.2005 | RO | 16.11.2005 | SI | 16.11.2005 | SK | 16.11.2005 | TR | 16.11.2005 | BG | 16.02.2006 | DK | 16.02.2006 | GR | 16.02.2006 | SE | 16.02.2006 | PT | 17.04.2006 | HU | 17.05.2006 | [2012/44] |
Former [2009/02] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
CY | 16.11.2005 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2005 | ||
EE | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
RO | 16.11.2005 | ||
SI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SK | 16.11.2005 | ||
TR | 16.11.2005 | ||
BG | 16.02.2006 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
HU | 17.05.2006 | ||
Former [2008/38] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
CZ | 16.11.2005 | ||
EE | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
RO | 16.11.2005 | ||
SI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SK | 16.11.2005 | ||
TR | 16.11.2005 | ||
BG | 16.02.2006 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
HU | 17.05.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
CZ | 16.11.2005 | ||
EE | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
RO | 16.11.2005 | ||
SI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SK | 16.11.2005 | ||
BG | 16.02.2006 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
HU | 17.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
CZ | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
RO | 16.11.2005 | ||
SI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SK | 16.11.2005 | ||
BG | 16.02.2006 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
HU | 17.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
CZ | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
IT | 16.11.2005 | ||
RO | 16.11.2005 | ||
SI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SK | 16.11.2005 | ||
BG | 16.02.2006 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
HU | 17.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
CZ | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
IT | 16.11.2005 | ||
SI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SK | 16.11.2005 | ||
BG | 16.02.2006 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
HU | 17.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
CZ | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SK | 16.11.2005 | ||
BG | 16.02.2006 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
HU | 17.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
CZ | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SK | 16.11.2005 | ||
BG | 16.02.2006 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
CZ | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SK | 16.11.2005 | ||
BG | 16.02.2006 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/41] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
CZ | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SK | 16.11.2005 | ||
BG | 16.02.2006 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
CZ | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SK | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
CZ | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
SK | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 16.11.2005 | |
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 16.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1060664 (BEAUDRY FREDERICK [US]) [A] * figure - *; | [A]US4435882 (UNGER GOETZ W [US]) [A] 1-16 * column 2, lines 42-60; figures 3-7 *; | [A]US4516305 (UNGER GOETZ W [US]) [A] * column 3, lines 3-31; figures 1,5-8 * |