EP1359062 - Air bag module assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.04.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2005 [2005/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. PO Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2003/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hawthorn, Laura A. 2775 West Charleston Road Tipp City, OH 45371 / US | 02 /
Pinsenschaum, Ryan T. 1101 Ronald Street Vandalia, OH 45377 / US | 03 /
Dunkle, Stephanie L. 5813 N St.-Rte. 741 Springboro, OH 45066 / US | 04 /
Kneisly, Ann L. 2422 Rossini Road Dayton, OH 45459 / US | [2003/45] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/45] | Denton, Michael John Delphi European Headquarters, 64 avenue de la Plaine de France, Paris Nord II, BP 60059, Tremblay-en-France 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 03075919.5 | 31.03.2003 | [2003/45] | Priority number, date | US20020125183 | 18.04.2002 Original published format: US 125183 | [2003/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1359062 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/16, B60R21/20 | [2003/45] | CPC: |
B60R21/237 (EP,US);
B60R21/16 (KR);
B60R21/205 (EP,US);
B60R21/2171 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/31] |
Former [2003/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Luftsackmodul | [2003/45] | English: | Air bag module assembly | [2003/45] | French: | Module de sac gonflable | [2003/45] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 02.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/20] | 20.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0897837 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-9,11-14,16,17* page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 58; figure - *; | [XY]US5944344 (YOSHIOKA KAZUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-9,11-14,16,17 * column 7, line 11 - column 16, line 15; figure - * [Y] 6,17; | [XY]DE20106599U (TRW REPA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-16 * page 2, line 20 - page 5, line 5; figure - * [Y] 6,17 |