EP1338519 - Loop pin connecting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M.I.T. International Co., Ltd. 9-7, Hino 7-chome, Kounan-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | For all designated states Lasco Co, Ltd. 8-12, Kashiwa 5-chome Kashiwa-shi Chiba / JP | [2006/25] |
Former [2003/35] | For all designated states M.I.T. International Co., Ltd. 9-7, Hino 7-chome, Kounan-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | ||
For all designated states Lasco Co, Ltd. 8-12, Kashiwa 5-chome Kashiwa-shi, Chiba / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shiraya, Junji c/o Lasco Co. Ltd., 8-12, Kashiwa 5-chome Kashiwa-shi, Chiba / JP | 02 /
Ueno, Hideyuki 9-7, Hino 7-chome, Kounan-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [2003/35] | Representative(s) | Dealtry, Brian Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/35] | Dealtry, Brian Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 03075925.2 | 27.04.2001 | [2003/35] | Priority number, date | US20000559425 | 27.04.2000 Original published format: US 559425 | US20000671704 | 28.09.2000 Original published format: US 671704 | [2003/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1338519 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1338519 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | [2003/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1338519 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65C7/00 | [2003/35] | CPC: |
B65C7/005 (EP,US);
B65C7/00 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T29/53487 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/35] | Title | German: | Werkzeug zum Verbinden von ringförmigen Nadeln | [2003/35] | English: | Loop pin connecting device | [2003/35] | French: | Pistolet de fixation d'épingles en boucle | [2003/35] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/35] | 03.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01303864.1 / EP1149770 | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 02.10.2006 | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/40] | IT | 21.06.2006 | |
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | ES | 02.10.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4536933 (FURUTSU AKIRA [JP]); | [X]US5799375 (FUKAMI SHOICHI [JP]) [X] 1 * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US6026544 (DESCHENES CHARLES L [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * |