20.06.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] |
20.07.2007 |
Change - applicant |
published on 22.08.2007 [2007/34] |
13.07.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.08.2007 [2007/33] |
13.07.2007 |
Change - priority |
published on 15.08.2007 [2007/33] |
06.07.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.04.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
13.04.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
25.11.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.11.2006 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] |
17.11.2006 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] |
05.05.2006 |
Change - applicant |
published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] |
06.04.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.11.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.11.2005 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
09.11.2005 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
02.11.2005 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
24.08.2005 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
25.06.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.05.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.01.2005 |
First examination report |
|
07.01.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.06.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.04.2004 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] |
19.03.2004 |
Change - representative |
published on 06.05.2004 [2004/19] |
06.02.2004 |
Change - inventor |
published on 24.03.2004 [2004/13] |
19.09.2003 |
Change - applicant |
published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] |
15.08.2003 |
Licence |
published on 01.10.2003 [2003/40] |
02.08.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.09.2003 [2003/38] |
02.08.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.09.2003 [2003/38] |
20.05.2003 |
Change - extension states |
|
30.04.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|