EP1344773 - Growth hormone secretagogues [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Æterna Zentaris GmbH Weismüllerstraße 50 60314 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/34] | For all designated states AEterna Zentaris GmbH Weismüllerstrasse 50 60314 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states Zentaris GmbH Weismüllerstrasse 50 60314 Frankfurt/Main / DE | ||
Former [2003/45] | For all designated states Zentaris GmbH Weismüllerstrasse 45 60314 Frankfurt/Main / DE | ||
Former [2003/38] | For all designated states Zentaris AG Weismüllerstrasse 45 60314 Frankfurt/Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fehrentz, Jean-Alain Rue des Saladelles 34400 St. Nazaire de Pezan / FR | 02 /
Martinez, Jean 9 rue Jean Moulin 34720 Le Jardin des Muses Caux / FR | 03 /
Guerlavais, Vincent 111, Embarcadero West, Apt. 1207 Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [2004/13] |
Former [2003/38] | 01 /
Fehrentz, Jean-Alain Rue des Saladelles 34400 St. Nazaire de Pezan / FR | ||
02 /
Martinez, Jean 9 rue Jean Moulin 34720 Le Jardin des Muses Caux / FR | |||
03 /
Guerlavais, Vincent 58, rue des Gabares Bat. B 34000 Montpellier / FR | Representative(s) | Miles, John Stephen Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | Miles, John Stephen Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2003/38] | McNeeney, Stephen Phillip Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 03075950.0 | 13.06.2001 | [2003/38] | Priority number, date | US20000211326P | 13.06.2000 Original published format: US 211326 P | US20000234928P | 26.09.2000 Original published format: US 234928 P | [2007/33] |
Former [2003/38] | US20000211326P | 13.06.2000 | |
US20000234928 | 26.09.2000 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1344773 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1344773 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/20, C07D401/14, C07D401/12, A61K31/405 | [2006/51] | CPC: |
C07K5/06078 (EP);
C07D209/20 (EP);
C07D401/12 (EP);
C07D401/14 (EP);
C07K5/0212 (EP);
C07K5/06026 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2003/38] | C07D209/20, C07D401/14, C07D401/12, A61K31/405, // (C07D401/12, 211:00, 209:00) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/38] | Title | German: | Wachstumhormonsekretionsförderer | [2003/38] | English: | Growth hormone secretagogues | [2003/38] | French: | Secrétagogues de l'hormone de croissance | [2003/38] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/38] | 12.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01943504.9 / EP1289951 | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/30] | Request for further processing for: | 28.10.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 28.10.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.11.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | For: | AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR | Licencee: | ARDANA BIOSCIENCE LIMITED 58 Queen Street Edinburgh EH2 3NS / GB | Date: | 06.06.2003 | [2007/33] |
Former [2003/40] | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | |
For: | all designated states | ||
Licencee: | ARDANA BIOSCIENCE LIMITED 58 Queen Street Edinburgh EH2 3NS / GB | ||
Date: | 06.06.2003 | ||
[2007/33] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9514666 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * examples 10,11,14,20,32 *; | [YD]WO9615148 (GENENTECH INC [US]) [YD] 1-14 * page 70, formula II; page 49, line 15 *; | [A] - DEGHENGHI, R. ET AL., "Impervious peptides as growth hormone secretagogues", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, XP002178718 [A] 1-14 * retrieved from STN Database accession no. 131:346807 Tripeptide EP51389 * | [A] - PATCHETT A A ET AL, "DESIGN AND BIOLOGICAL ACTIVITIES OF L-163,191 (MK-0677): A POTENT, ORALLY ACTIVE GROWTH HORMONE SECRETAGOGUE", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (19950701), vol. 92, no. 15, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 7001 - 7005, XP000651085 [A] 1-14 * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.92.15.7001 | [A] - MCDOWEEL, ROBERT S. ET AL., "Growth hormone secretagogues", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, XP002178719 [A] 1-14 * abstract * | [ ] - PEPT. SCI.: PRESENT FUTURE, PROC. INT. PEPT. SYMP., 1ST, (1999), pages 411 - 412 | [ ] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, WASHINGTON US, (1995), vol. 92, no. 24, pages 11165 - 11169 |