EP1466529 - Composition with heart rate reducing properties [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.04.2009 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.05.2009 [2009/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chr. Hansen A/S P.O. Box 407 Boge Alle 10-12 2970 Horsholm / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | For all designated states CHR. HANSEN A/S P.O. Box 407 Boge Alle 10-12 2970 Horsholm / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Flambard, Bénédicte Ingemannsvej 30, 3. tv. 1964 Frederiksberg / DK | [2004/42] | Application number, filing date | 03076018.5 | 07.04.2003 | [2004/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1466529 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A23C9/123, A23C11/10, C12P21/02, A61K38/01 | [2004/42] | CPC: |
A61K38/018 (EP,KR);
A23C11/106 (KR);
A23C9/1234 (EP,KR);
A23K20/147 (EP,KR);
A23L33/18 (EP,KR);
A23L33/19 (EP,KR);
A61K35/20 (EP,KR);
A61K36/00 (EP,KR);
A61K38/02 (EP,KR);
A61P13/12 (EP,KR);
A61P3/06 (EP,KR);
A61P9/04 (EP,KR);
A61P9/06 (EP,KR);
A61P9/10 (EP,KR);
A61P9/12 (EP,KR);
C12N1/205 (EP,KR);
C12N9/52 (EP,KR);
C12P21/00 (EP);
C12P21/06 (EP,KR);
A23C2220/202 (EP,KR);
A23V2400/147 (EP,KR);
C12R2001/225 (EP,KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K36/00, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/42] | Title | German: | Präparat mit herzfrequenzsenkenden Eigenschaften | [2004/42] | English: | Composition with heart rate reducing properties | [2004/42] | French: | Composition destinée à reduire la fréquence cardiaque | [2004/42] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 18.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0821968 (CALPIS FOOD IND CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1-10 * example - *; | [DA]WO0185984 (DAVISCO INTERNAT FOODS INC [US], et al) [DA] 1-10* page 18, line 11 - page 20, line 18 *; | [DA] - GUGLSANG, A. ET AL., "Cardiovascular effects of fermented milk containing angiotensin-converting enzyme inhibitors evaluated in permanently catheterized, spontaneously hypertensive rats", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (20020701), vol. 68, no. 7, pages 3566 - 3569, XP002252114 [DA] 1-10 * page 3569, column 1, paragraph 2; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.68.7.3566-3569.2002 |