EP1467248 - Photographic colour material containing a resorcinol derivative as black coupler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2006 [2006/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Photo Film B.V. Oudenstraat 1 5047 TK Tilburg / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | For all designated states Fuji Photo Film B.V. Oudenstaart 1 5047 TK Tilburg / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van Boxtel, Huibert Albertus Rustenburgstraat 4 5035 DJ Tilburg / NL | 02 /
Iwasa, Yasuo Gounodlaan 56 5049 AG Tilburg / NL | 03 /
Kase, Akira Nistelrodestraat 43 5045 MD Tilburg / NL | 04 /
Toda, Yuzo S.v. Grobbendoncklaan 1A 5051 KZ Goirle / NL | [2004/42] | Representative(s) | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | Prins, Adrianus Willem, Mr. Ir., et al Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 03076067.2 | 11.04.2003 | [2004/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1467248 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/34 | [2004/42] | CPC: |
G03C7/346 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/27] |
Former [2004/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Photographisches Farbmeterial beinhaltend ein Resorcinolderivat als Schwarzkuppler | [2004/42] | English: | Photographic colour material containing a resorcinol derivative as black coupler | [2004/42] | French: | Matériau photographique couleur contenant un dérivé du résorcinol comme copulant noir | [2004/42] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/03] | 19.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.05.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.05.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS58140739 ; | [A]EP0069066 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [X]US4387158 (POSTLE STEPHEN R [GB]) [X] 1-10 * column 1, line 3 - line 6 * * claim - *; | [X]US4429035 (KATO EIICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * claims 1-5 *; | [X]US4439518 (POSTLE STEPHEN R [GB]) [X] 1-10 * column 1, line 8 - line 10 * * claim - *; | [DX]EP0568777 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [DX] 1-10 * page 2, line 3 - line 5 * * page 5 - page 6; figures A1-A5 * * page 19, line 17 - line 23; table 3 * * page 20; table 4 * * claims 1,4,8 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831115), vol. 007, no. 256, Database accession no. (P - 236), & JP58140739 A 19830820 (FUJI SHASHIN FILM KK) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 3 - page 4; figures 1-18 * |