EP1365111 - Retention bolt for a cam phaser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2008 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. PO Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2003/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Borraccia, Dominic 13 Airy Drive Spencerport, NY 14559 / US | 02 /
Pierik, Ronald J. 26 Royal View Drive Rochester, NY 14625-1142 / US | [2003/48] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | Denton, Michael John Delphi European Headquarters, 64 avenue de la Plaine de France, Paris Nord II, BP 60059, Tremblay-en-France 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 03076355.1 | 07.05.2003 | [2003/48] | Priority number, date | US20020382237P | 21.05.2002 Original published format: US 382237 P | [2003/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1365111 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1365111 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F01L1/34, F01L1/344 | [2003/48] | CPC: |
F01L1/344 (EP,US);
F01L1/022 (EP,US);
F01L1/34 (EP,US);
F01L1/3442 (EP,US);
F01L1/024 (EP,US);
F01L2001/34426 (EP,US);
F01L2001/3443 (EP,US);
F01L2001/34433 (EP,US);
F01L2001/34469 (EP,US);
F01L2001/34479 (EP,US);
F01L2001/34483 (EP,US);
F01L2800/01 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49325 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/35] |
Former [2003/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schraubensicherungsanordnung für einen Nockenwellenversteller | [2003/48] | English: | Retention bolt for a cam phaser | [2003/48] | French: | Boulon de serrage pour déphaseur | [2003/48] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/52] | 30.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5943989 (KIRA NAOKI [JP]) [A] 1,11* figure 1 *; | [A]US6085708 (TRZMIEL ALFRED [DE], et al) [A] 1,11 * column 3, line 5 - column 5, line 43 *; | [A]US6105543 (OGAWA KAZUMI [JP]) [A] 1,11 * figure 1 *; | [X]US6182622 (GOLOYATAI-SCHMIDT EDUARD [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,7,9-11 * column 6, line 65 - column 9, line 20; figure 1 *; | [A]US6363896 (SPEIER WOLFGANG [DE]) [A] 1,11 * column 2, line 64 - column 4, line 27 * |