EP1364826 - Overhead supply line renewal device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volker Stevin Rail & Traffic Materieel BV Lange Dreef 7 4131 NJ Vianen / NL | [2003/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bosch, Jan Willem Lange Dreef 7 4131 NJ Vianen / NL | [2003/48] | Representative(s) | Assendelft, Jacobus H.W. Keukenhofdreef 20 2161 AZ Lisse / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | Assendelft, Jacobus H.W. Keukenhofdreef 20 2161 AZ Lisse / NL | Application number, filing date | 03076520.0 | 21.05.2003 | [2003/48] | Priority number, date | NL20021020642 | 21.05.2002 Original published format: NL 1020642 | NL20021021580 | 04.10.2002 Original published format: NL 1021580 | NL20031023477 | 20.05.2003 Original published format: NL 1023477 | [2003/48] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1364826 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60M1/28 | [2003/48] | CPC: |
B60M1/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/48] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Erneuerung eines Oberleitungsdrahtes | [2003/48] | English: | Overhead supply line renewal device | [2003/48] | French: | Dispositif pour le renouvellement d'une ligne d'alimentation aérienne | [2003/48] | Examination procedure | 25.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 01.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/21] | 06.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.12.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9215470 (ELIN ENERGIEVERSORGUNG [AT]) [A] 1-5,9,10* page 5, line 33 - page 8, line 3; figures 1-3 *; | [XA]DE10007093 (STALVOSS GES FUER STAHLBAU KRA [DE]) [X] 1,10 * column 4, line 58 - column 8, line 32; figures 1-9 * [A] 2-9; | [XA]DE10039064 (DB NETZ AG [DE]) [X] 1,10 * column 4, line 13 - column 5, line 45; figures 1-4 * [A] 2-6,8,9 |