EP1447874 - Solid-oxide fuel cell system having an integrated reformer and waste energy recovery system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. PO Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2004/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kelly, Sean Michael 141 Brightwoods Lane Brighton, NY 14623 / US | 02 /
Haltiner, Karl Jacob, Jr. 28 center Crossing Fairport, NY 14450 / US | 03 /
Faville, Michael Thomas 5183 Triphammel Road Geneseo, NY 14454 / US | 04 /
Schumann, David Robert 11 Holly Circle Spencerport, New York 14559 / US | [2004/34] | Representative(s) | Robert, Vincent Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | Robert, Vincent Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/34] | Denton, Michael John Delphi European Headquarters 64 avenue de la Pleine de France Paris Nord II B.P. 65059, Tremblay en France 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2004/34] | Denton, Michael John Delphi European Headquarters, 64, avenue de la Plaine de France, Paris Nord II, B.P. 60059, Tremblay en France 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 03076663.8 | 28.05.2003 | [2004/34] | Priority number, date | US20020178808 | 24.06.2002 Original published format: US 178808 | [2004/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1447874 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1447874 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | [2009/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/06, C01B3/34, H01M8/04, B01J19/24 | [2009/42] | CPC: |
C01B3/34 (EP,US);
H01M8/2485 (US);
H01M8/04022 (EP,US);
H01M8/0618 (EP,US);
H01M8/0631 (EP,US);
H01M8/0662 (EP,US);
H01M8/2432 (US);
C01B2203/0227 (EP,US);
C01B2203/066 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0811 (EP,US);
H01M2008/1293 (EP,US);
H01M2250/20 (EP,US);
H01M8/04201 (EP,US);
H01M8/2425 (EP);
H01M8/2475 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP,US);
Y02P20/10 (EP,US);
Y02P20/129 (EP,US);
Y02T90/40 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/34] | H01M8/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/25] |
Former [2004/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Festoxidbrennstoffzellensystem mit integriertem Reformer und Energierückgewinnung System | [2004/34] | English: | Solid-oxide fuel cell system having an integrated reformer and waste energy recovery system | [2004/34] | French: | Système de piles à combustible à oxydes solides ayant un reformeur intégré et un système de récupération d'énergie | [2004/34] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/21] | 15.04.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.05.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/23] | 17.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0673074 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [A] 1-24* column 20, line 20 - line 37 *; | [A]DE19746251 (DBB FUEL CELL ENGINES GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-24 * figure 1 * * column 1, line 1 - line 16 * * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 24 * * column 5, line 29 - column 6, line 9 *; | [A]WO9953561 (INT FUEL CELLS LLC [US]) [A] 1-24 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 25 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]JP2001227419 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1,3-4,6,21-22,24 * abstract *; | [I]US2001049039 (HALTINER KARL J [US]) [I] 1-24 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019] *; | [A]WO0205363 (GLOBAL THERMOELECTRIC INC [CA]) [A] 1-24 * page 1, line 10 - page 2, line 23 * * claims 7,8,9 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2002025458 (FAVILLE MICHAEL T [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * paragraphs [0032] , [0033] , [0057] * |