EP1375176 - Conductive foam core imaging member [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Majumdar, Debasis, c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Dontula, Narasimharao, Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 03 /
Sunderrajan, Suresh, c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 04 /
Aylward, Peter Thomas, c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 05 /
Robinson, Kelly Stephen, c/o Eastman kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 06 /
Kestner, Melvin Michael, c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Boite n 2 Zone d'activité SAONEOR 12 rue Alfred Kastler 71530 Fragnes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Industrie, Département Brevets, CRT, Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 03076785.9 | 10.06.2003 | [2004/01] | Priority number, date | US20020176012 | 20.06.2002 Original published format: US 176012 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1375176 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/00, B41M5/40, G03C1/795, G03C1/85, G03G7/00 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
G03G5/10 (EP,US);
G03C1/76 (KR);
B41M5/41 (EP,US);
B41M5/502 (EP,US);
G03C1/795 (EP,US);
Y10S977/742 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/39] |
Former [2004/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Leitfähiges Schaumkernbildelement | [2004/01] | English: | Conductive foam core imaging member | [2004/01] | French: | Elément conducteur avec un noyau en mousse pour former des images | [2004/01] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/15] | 09.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.08.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2004 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.08.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 18.08.2004 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP1211557 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [XD] 1-10 * page 2, line 5 - line 6 * * page 5, line 2 - line 5 * * page 5, line 23 - line 30 * * page 6, line 31 - line 56 ** example 1; claim 1 * | by applicant | US4275103 | US4832775 | US5244728 | US5683862 | US5851651 | US5866282 | US5955190 | US6171769 |