EP1488963 - Adjustable inner floor for pedals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC Fairlane Plaza South Suite 800 330 Town Center Drive Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC Fairlane Plaza South Suite 800 330 Town Center Drive Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | ||
Former [2006/20] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC. Fairlane Plaza South Suite 800 330 Town Center Drive Dearborn MI 48126 / US | ||
Former [2004/52] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC 600, Parklane Towers East Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fosse, Tore Näckrosvägen 9 423 52 Torslanda / SE | [2004/52] | Representative(s) | Hammond, Andrew David Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Gothenburg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Hammond, Andrew David Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2004/52] | Hammond, Andrew David Ström & Gulliksson IP AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Gothenburg / SE | Application number, filing date | 03076886.5 | 17.06.2003 | [2004/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1488963 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1488963 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/09 | [2004/52] | CPC: |
B60T7/065 (EP);
B60R21/09 (EP);
B60R2021/0213 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [2005/37] |
Former [2004/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verstellbare Innenbodenfläche für Fusspedale | [2004/52] | English: | Adjustable inner floor for pedals | [2004/52] | French: | Plancher intérieur ajustable pour pédalier | [2004/52] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 27.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1278919 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [A] 1 * page 1, line 27 - line 35 * * page 1, line 55 - page 2, line 16 ** figure 1 *; | [X]DE19541607 (HAFERKORN LUTZ [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * claim 2 * * figure . *; | [XA]DE19727598 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 7 * * figure 3 * [A] 2; | [Y]EP1010588 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 1,2,6,7,13,14 * abstract * * column 5, line 1 - line 10 * * column 5, line 30 - line 56 * * figure 5 *; | [Y]US6182525 (BOWERS PAUL A [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,6,7,13,14 * column 1, line 10 - line 22 *; | [XA]US6349965 (HEILIG ALEXANDER [DE]) [X] 1,7 * abstract * * column 2, line 28 - line 39 * * column 5, line 19 - line 43 * * column 5, line 49 - line 51 * * column 6, line 20 - line 22 * * figure - * [A] 2 |