EP1380860 - Process for forming an Optical Compensator Film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2004/03] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Castle, Richard A., c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Elman, James F., c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 03 /
Hoff, Joseph W., c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 04 /
Payne, Jason A., c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [2004/03] | Representative(s) | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/03] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 03077033.3 | 30.06.2003 | [2004/03] | Priority number, date | US20020195094 | 12.07.2002 Original published format: US 195094 | [2004/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1380860 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/30, G02F1/13363, B29D11/00 | [2004/03] | CPC: |
G02F1/13363 (EP,US);
G02F1/1335 (KR);
B29D11/0073 (EP,US);
G02B5/3016 (EP,US);
G02F1/133633 (EP,US);
G02F2413/04 (EP,US);
G02F2413/105 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/41] |
Former [2004/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Optischen Kompensationsfilms | [2004/03] | English: | Process for forming an Optical Compensator Film | [2004/03] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un film de compensation optique | [2004/03] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/15] | 09.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.08.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.08.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.08.2004 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH11142647 ; | [Y]JPH10206635 ; | [Y]EP0977075 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraphs [0093] - [0097] * * paragraph [0120]; example 1A *; | [Y]EP0992816 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0010] - [0020] * * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0072]; example 2 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990831), vol. 1999, no. 10, & JP11142647 A 19990528 (DAINIPPON INK &CHEM INC) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10206635 A 19980807 (FUJITSU LTD) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * |