EP1378405 - Method for the provision later on of fastening means for fastening a safety belt [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carrosseriefabriek Tijmen Ploeg BV Heliumweg 44 3812 RE Amersfoort / NL | [2006/20] |
Former [2004/02] | For all designated states Carrosseriefabriek Tijmen Ploeg BV Heliumweg 44 3812 RE Amersfoort / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ploeg, Marinus Zevenhuizerstraat 55 3828 BC Hoogland / NL | [2004/02] | Representative(s) | Kupecz, Arpad Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. Weteringschans 96 1017 XS Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/02] | Kupecz, A., Drs. c.s. Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. Weteringschans 96 1017 XS Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 03077177.8 | 07.07.2003 | [2004/02] | Priority number, date | NL20021021017 | 05.07.2002 Original published format: NL 1021017 | NL20021021672 | 17.10.2002 Original published format: NL 1021672 | [2004/02] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1378405 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1378405 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60R22/18, B62D25/08 | [2004/02] | CPC: |
B60R22/18 (EP);
B60R2021/0074 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur nachträglichen Montage von Befestigungsmittel für einen Sicherheitsgurt | [2004/02] | English: | Method for the provision later on of fastening means for fastening a safety belt | [2004/02] | French: | Méthode de montage par après de moyens de fixation pour une ceinture de sécurité | [2004/02] | Examination procedure | 07.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/37] | 04.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.05.2006 | CH | 17.05.2006 | CY | 17.05.2006 | CZ | 17.05.2006 | EE | 17.05.2006 | FI | 17.05.2006 | IT | 17.05.2006 | LI | 17.05.2006 | NL | 17.05.2006 | RO | 17.05.2006 | SI | 17.05.2006 | SK | 17.05.2006 | TR | 17.05.2006 | IE | 07.07.2006 | MC | 31.07.2006 | BG | 17.08.2006 | SE | 17.08.2006 | GR | 18.08.2006 | ES | 28.08.2006 | PT | 17.10.2006 | HU | 18.11.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/38] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2006 | ||
EE | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
RO | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
TR | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 07.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
BG | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
HU | 18.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2006 | ||
EE | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
RO | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 07.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
BG | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
HU | 18.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2006 | ||
EE | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
RO | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 07.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
BG | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2006 | ||
EE | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
RO | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 07.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
RO | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 07.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
RO | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 07.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 07.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 07.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 17.08.2006 | |
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 17.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE4026939 (WESTFALIA WERKE KNOEBEL [DE]) [X] 1-4,8 * column 4, line 31 - column 32; figure - * [A] 5-7,9,10; | [A]DE19744664 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1-10* the whole document * |