EP1403812 - Electronic color dropout utilizing spatial context to enhance accuracy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.03.2009 [2009/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2008/14] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | ||
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barton, Mark A. Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [2004/14] | Representative(s) | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Boite n 2 Zone d'activité SAONEOR 12 rue Alfred Kastler 71530 Fragnes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Industrie, Département Brevets, CRT, Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 03077654.6 | 25.08.2003 | [2004/14] | Priority number, date | US20020235015 | 04.09.2002 Original published format: US 235015 | [2004/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1403812 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1403812 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | [2006/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1403812 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/20, G06T5/00 | [2004/14] | CPC: |
G06V10/143 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/51] |
Former [2004/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektronische Farbentfernung unter Verwendung des räumlichen Kontextes zur Verbesserung der Genauigkeit | [2004/14] | English: | Electronic color dropout utilizing spatial context to enhance accuracy | [2004/14] | French: | Elimination électronique de couleur utilisant un contexte spatial afin d'améliorer la précision | [2004/14] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 10.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4856074 (NAGAOKA DAIJI [JP]) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]US6035059 (KUROSAWA YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 5, line 23 - line 38 * * abstract *; | [PA]US2002136447 (LINK BRUCE A [US], et al) [PA] 1-8* abstract * |