EP1520603 - Solid state brachytherapy applicator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nucletron B.V. Waardgelder 1 3905 TH Veenendaal / NL | [2005/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kindlein, Johann Rebhuhnweg 13 47918 Toenisvorst / DE | [2005/14] | Representative(s) | Valkonet, Rutger, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Valkonet, Rutger, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2005/14] | Valkonet, Rutger, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 03078121.5 | 03.10.2003 | [2005/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1520603 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1520603 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/10 | [2005/14] | CPC: |
A61N5/1001 (EP,US);
H01J35/065 (EP,US);
H01J35/32 (EP,US);
H01J2235/205 (EP,US);
H01J35/186 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/14] | Title | German: | Festkörper-Applikator zur Brachytherapie | [2005/14] | English: | Solid state brachytherapy applicator | [2005/14] | French: | Applicateur à l'état solide pour la brachythérapie | [2005/14] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/35] | 20.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.12.2009 | BE | 09.12.2009 | CY | 09.12.2009 | CZ | 09.12.2009 | DK | 09.12.2009 | EE | 09.12.2009 | FI | 09.12.2009 | IT | 09.12.2009 | RO | 09.12.2009 | SE | 09.12.2009 | SI | 09.12.2009 | SK | 09.12.2009 | TR | 09.12.2009 | BG | 09.03.2010 | GR | 10.03.2010 | ES | 20.03.2010 | PT | 09.04.2010 | HU | 10.06.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
IT | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
HU | 10.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
IT | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 09.12.2009 | |
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 09.12.2009 | |
SE | 09.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9707740 (INTERVENTIONAL INNOVATIONS COR [US]) [Y] 7,8,11-13 * page 9, line 1 - page 10, line 10 *; | [X]US5729583 (TANG CHA-MEI [US], et al) [X] 1,5-8,11-13 * column 4, line 12 - line 51; figures 3A,4A * * column 6, line 25 - column 11, line 9; figure 9 *; | [Y]EP0860180 (INTERVENTIONAL INNOVATIONS COR [US]) [Y] 3,4 * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 12; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE19829444 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-7 * column 4, line 5 - line 35 *; | [X]DE19854287 (LEONHARDT JUERGEN [DE]) [X] 14 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 26 *; | [A]WO0185255 (RADI MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES AB [SE]) [A] 9,10 * page 2, line 3 - line 26 * * page 5, line 13 - page 6, line 27 *; | [X]US6320935 (SHINAR GUY [IL], et al) [X] 14* column 5, line 57 - column 6, line 62 *; | [DXY]US6477233 (RIBBING CAROLINA [SE], et al) [DX] 1,2,5,6 * column 3, line 8 - line 35; figure 1 * * column 4, line 12 - line 19; figure 3 * * column 5, line 36 - line 62; figures 8,9 * [Y] 3,4,7,8,11-13; | [X]EP1316330 (NUCLETRON BV [NL]) [X] 14 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6477233 |