EP1416132 - Exhaust emission control devices and method of making the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. PO Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2004/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Turek, Alan Gerard 8774 Rich Road Mayville, MI 48744 / US | 02 /
Boehnke, John C. 4280 Wilderness Court Grand Blanc, MI 48439 / US | [2004/19] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | Denton, Michael John Delphi European Headquarters, 64 avenue de la Plaine de France, Paris Nord II, BP 60059, Tremblay-en-France 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 03078222.1 | 13.10.2003 | [2004/19] | Priority number, date | US20020284013 | 29.10.2002 Original published format: US 284013 | [2004/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1416132 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1416132 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/28, F01N3/00, F01N7/14 | [2004/19] | CPC: |
F01N3/2846 (EP,US);
F01N2350/04 (EP,US);
F01N2450/02 (EP,US);
F01N3/0222 (EP,US);
F01N3/281 (EP,US);
F01N3/2828 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/04] |
Former [2004/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Abgasemissionssteuerung und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [2004/19] | English: | Exhaust emission control devices and method of making the same | [2004/19] | French: | Dispositif de régulation des émissions de gaz d'échappement et son procédé de fabrication | [2004/19] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/01] | 09.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 28.12.2005 | [2009/01] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5686039 (MERRY RICHARD P [US]) [X] 11,12,14-16 * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 16 ** column 6, line 41 - line 50; figure 1 *; | [XY]US5869010 (LANGER ROGER L [US]) [X] 11,12,14-16 * column 4, line 42 - line 49 * * column 7, line 31 - line 57 * * column 10, line 16 - line 63; figures 1,2 * [Y] 13; | [YA]US6128821 (GRESCHER BERNARD [DE]) [Y] 13 * column 4, line 62 - column 5, line 19; figure 1 * [A] 2-6 |