EP1419895 - Increased contrast overhead projection films [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2004/21] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaminsky, Cheryl J. Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Bourdelais, Robert P. Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [2004/21] | Representative(s) | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/21] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 03078223.9 | 13.10.2003 | [2004/21] | Priority number, date | US20020279599 | 24.10.2002 Original published format: US 279599 | [2004/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1419895 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1419895 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | [2005/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/00 | [2004/21] | CPC: |
B41M5/36 (EP,US);
B41M3/008 (EP,US);
B41M5/38207 (EP,US);
B41M5/502 (EP,US);
G03B21/132 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2495 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/35] |
Former [2004/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Overhead-Projektionsfolien mit verbessertem Kontrast | [2004/21] | English: | Increased contrast overhead projection films | [2004/21] | French: | Transparents pour la rétroprojection avec contraste amélioré | [2004/21] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/16] | 30.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.08.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.08.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5156709 (MAMMINO JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure - *; | [AD]US5852514 (TOSHIMA YASUMARO [JP], et al) [AD] 1-15 * figure 1 ** claim - * |