EP1416294 - Apparatus and method for radiation verification [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spoonhower, John P., c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Paz-Pujalt, Gustavo R., c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 03 /
Stephany, Thomas M., c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [2004/19] | Representative(s) | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [2004/19] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited, Patents Department (W92-3A), Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 03078302.1 | 20.10.2003 | [2004/19] | Priority number, date | US20020283538 | 30.10.2002 Original published format: US 283538 | [2004/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1416294 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/04, G01V5/00 | [2004/19] | CPC: |
G01V5/26 (EP,US);
G01T1/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/04] |
Former [2004/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Apparat und Methode für Strahlung Überprüfung | [2004/19] | English: | Apparatus and method for radiation verification | [2004/19] | French: | Procédé et méthode pour la vérification de rayonnement | [2004/19] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 27.06.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3995741 (HENDERSON JOSEPH P W) [X] 1-5,7-9 * abstract * * column 1, line 38 - line 43 * * column 2, line 14 - line 16 * * column 2, line 31 - line 60 * * column 3, line 5 - line 8 * * column 3, line 16 - line 25 * * figure - *; | [AD]US4918317 (HESS TODD M [US], et al) [AD] 1-5,7-10 * column A * * column 1, line 40 - line 53 * * column 2, line 8 - line 14 * * column 5, line 3 - line 43 * * figure - *; | [X]US5109153 (JOHNSEN EDWARD L [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-9 * column A * * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 30 * * column 3, line 6 - line 51 * * column 3, line 61 - line 67 * * column 4, line 25 - line 52 * * figure - *; | [A] - TOKIMA T ET AL, "POLYMER-ALANINE DOSIMETER AND COMPACT READER", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF RADIATION APPLICATIONS AND INSTRUMENTATION PART A: APPLIED RADIATION AND ISOTOPES, PERGAMON PRESS LTD., EXETER, GB, (1989), vol. 40, no. 10 - 12, pages 851 - 857, XP000087526 [A] 2,6 * see complete document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0883-2889(89)90006-3 |