Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1420370
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
24.02.2006 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 12.04.2006 [2006/15] |
30.11.2005 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
27.10.2005 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
27.07.2005 |
Change: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
27.07.2005 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
30.06.2005 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
29.06.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.04.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
20.04.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
18.03.2005 |
First examination report |
|
11.03.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.03.2005 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
24.12.2004 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 09.02.2005 [2005/06] |
22.12.2004 |
New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
03.12.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.01.2005 [2005/03] |
14.05.2004 |
Change - priority |
published on 30.06.2004 [2004/27] |
02.04.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] |