EP1469132 - A lavatory bowl rim-block providing a combination of ongoing perfume delivery with a perfume boost upon flushing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 11.04.2014 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.2014 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] | 11.04.2014 | Change - representative | published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2014/20] |
Former [2007/34] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | ||
Former [2004/43] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Belder, Gian C. Paulusstraat 17 2630 Aartselaar / BE | 02 /
Metrot, Veronique Sylvie 8 rue Tervaete 1040 Brussel / BE | 03 /
Papadaki, Maria Kapellelaan 344 1860 Meise / BE | 04 /
Rogers, Neil John Streekbaan 10 1800 Vilvoorde / BE | 05 /
Ronn, Karl Patrick 8055 Graves Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45243 / US | 06 /
Tomarchio, Vincenzo Place Georges Brugman 24 1050 Brussel / BE | 07 /
Reynen, Michael Jakob Madeliefjesstraat 52 1850 Grimbergen / BE | [2004/43] | Representative(s) | Kellenberger, Jakob NV Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Intellectual Property Department Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/20] | Kellenberger, Jakob NV Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Intellectual Property Department Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [2010/11] | Samuels, Lucy Alice, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street GB-London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2009/50] | Kellenberger, Jakob, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Intellectual Property Department Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [2004/43] | Kellenberger, Jakob, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA, Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 03078382.3 | 28.10.2003 | [2004/43] | Priority number, date | EP20030076096 | 15.04.2003 Original published format: EP 03076096 | [2004/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1469132 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1469132 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | [2005/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1469132 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/34] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1469132 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E03D9/00, E03D9/03, C11D3/50, C11D17/00, C11D17/04 | [2004/43] | CPC: |
C11D3/50 (EP,US);
C11D17/041 (EP,US);
E03D9/007 (EP,US);
E03D9/032 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0029 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/43] | Title | German: | Unter dem Spülrand eines Toilettenbeckens zu montierende Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung einer Kombination aus permanenter Duftabgabe und eines Duftstosses beim Spülen | [2004/43] | English: | A lavatory bowl rim-block providing a combination of ongoing perfume delivery with a perfume boost upon flushing | [2004/43] | French: | Dispositif de rafraichissement d'une cuvette de W.C. pour l'émission permanente d'une fragrance en combinaison avec une émission spécifique de fragrance pendant la chasse d'eau | [2004/43] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/25] | 15.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07111293.2 / EP1840280 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.05.2008
27.05.2008
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Prothmann, Thomas, et al, et al Henkel AG & Co. KGaA VTP Patente 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | 02
19.05.2008
29.07.2008
ADMISSIBLE Reckitt Benckiser PLC 103-105 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3UH / GB Opponent's representative Bowers, Craig Malcolm Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.05.2008
27.05.2008
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Prothmann, Thomas, et al, et al Henkel AG & Co. KGaA VTP Patente 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
19.05.2008
29.07.2008
ADMISSIBLE Reckitt Benckiser PLC 103-105 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3UH / GB Opponent's representative Bowers, Craig Malcolm Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | |||
Former [2008/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.05.2008
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Prothmann, Thomas, et al, et al Henkel AG & Co. KGaA VTP Patente 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
19.05.2008
Reckitt Benckiser PLC 103-105 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3UH / GB Opponent's representative Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | 01.08.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.02.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.02.2009 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2009 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 17.02.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.03.2011 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 07.03.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 12.09.2013 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 01.04.2014 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 09.05.2011 | Appeal received No. T1128/11 | 14.07.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 12.09.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 28.04.2011 | Appeal received No. T1128/11 | 28.04.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 12.09.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 12.09.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.09.2013 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.08.2007 | BE | 22.08.2007 | CH | 22.08.2007 | CY | 22.08.2007 | CZ | 22.08.2007 | DK | 22.08.2007 | EE | 22.08.2007 | FI | 22.08.2007 | LI | 22.08.2007 | NL | 22.08.2007 | RO | 22.08.2007 | SI | 22.08.2007 | SK | 22.08.2007 | TR | 22.08.2007 | LU | 28.10.2007 | IE | 30.10.2007 | MC | 31.10.2007 | BG | 22.11.2007 | SE | 22.11.2007 | GR | 23.11.2007 | PT | 22.01.2008 | HU | 23.02.2008 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 22.08.2007 | |
BE | 22.08.2007 | ||
CH | 22.08.2007 | ||
CY | 22.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2007 | ||
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
EE | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
LI | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
RO | 22.08.2007 | ||
SI | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
LU | 28.10.2007 | ||
IE | 30.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
SE | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 22.08.2007 | |
BE | 22.08.2007 | ||
CH | 22.08.2007 | ||
CY | 22.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2007 | ||
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
EE | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
LI | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
RO | 22.08.2007 | ||
SI | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 30.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
SE | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 22.08.2007 | |
BE | 22.08.2007 | ||
CH | 22.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2007 | ||
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
EE | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
LI | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
RO | 22.08.2007 | ||
SI | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 30.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
SE | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 22.08.2007 | |
BE | 22.08.2007 | ||
CH | 22.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2007 | ||
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
EE | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
LI | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
RO | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 30.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
SE | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 22.08.2007 | |
BE | 22.08.2007 | ||
CH | 22.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2007 | ||
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
LI | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
RO | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 30.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
SE | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 22.08.2007 | |
BE | 22.08.2007 | ||
CH | 22.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2007 | ||
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
LI | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
RO | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
SE | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 22.08.2007 | |
BE | 22.08.2007 | ||
CH | 22.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2007 | ||
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
LI | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 22.08.2007 | |
BE | 22.08.2007 | ||
CH | 22.08.2007 | ||
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
LI | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 22.08.2007 | |
BE | 22.08.2007 | ||
CH | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
LI | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 22.08.2007 | |
CH | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
LI | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 22.08.2007 | |
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 22.08.2007 | |
BG | 22.11.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4709425 (BAVAVEAS TRISTAN [FR]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 33 - column 3, line 34 *; | [A]GB918218 (HOWELL DAVID) [A] 1 * page 1, line 8 - line 32 *; | [A]US3359063 (EDWARD MAUDE) [A] 1 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 48 *; | [A]WO03027405 (MCBRIDE ROBERT LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * | Opposition | US1091265 | US4555819 | DE10113036 | WO2004081303 | DE69709759T | WO03042462 |