EP1426043 - Effervescent pharmaceutical compositions for non conventional suspensions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states (deleted) ... | [2008/28] |
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states B.S.D. Piazza Cavour, 5 20060 Bussero (Milan) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Omini, Claudio piazza Cavour, 5 20060 Bussero / IT | 02 /
Zuccari, Giuseppe via Europa, 25 26866 Sant'Angelo Lodigiano / IT | [2004/24] | Application number, filing date | 03078404.5 | 30.10.2003 | [2004/24] | Priority number, date | IT2002MI02358 | 07.11.2002 Original published format: IT mi20022358 | [2004/24] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1426043 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/10, A61K9/14 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
A61K9/146 (EP);
A23L2/40 (EP);
A23L33/10 (EP);
A61K9/0007 (EP);
A61K9/10 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/507, A23V2250/50362, A23V2250/21, A23V2200/226, A23V2250/063, A23V2250/0648, A23V2250/0628, A23V2250/0626 (EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/507, A23V2250/50362, A23V2250/21, A23V2200/226, A23V2250/242 (EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/507, A23V2250/50362, A23V2250/21, A23V2200/226, A23V2250/642, A23V2250/246 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/24] | Title | German: | Brausezubereitungen für nichtkonventionelle Suspensionen | [2004/24] | English: | Effervescent pharmaceutical compositions for non conventional suspensions | [2004/24] | French: | Compositions effervescentes pour des suspensions non conventionelles | [2004/24] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 21.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/16] | 24.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   03.05.2006 | 31.10.2006 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2007 | 31.10.2007 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.03.2008 | 31.10.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]WO9200731 (EURAND INT [IT]) [DX] 1-6,13-16,18,20,23,24,26 * page 5, line 13 - line 26 * * example 1 *; | [X]US5211957 (HAGEMANN RUTH [CH], et al) [X] 1-4,13-15,18,20,23,24,26* examples 1-9 *; | [X]FR2753097 (BARRAU FRANCOIS [FR]) [X] 1-6,13-15,18,20,23,24,26 * example 1 * |