EP1443209 - Water pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.12.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Interpump Engineering S.r.l. 2, Via G.B. Vico 42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | [2004/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Montipo' Fulvio 53, Viale Umberto I 42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | [2004/32] | Representative(s) | Corradini, Corrado, et al Ing. C. Corradini & C. S.r.l. Via Dante Alighieri 4 42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Corradini, Corrado, et al Ing. C. CORRADINI & C. S.r.l. Via Dante Alighieri 4 42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | ||
Former [2004/32] | Corradini, Corrado, et al Ing. C. Corradini & C. S.R.L. Via Dante Alighieri 4 I-42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | Application number, filing date | 03078651.1 | 20.11.2003 | [2004/32] | Priority number, date | IT2003RE00001 | 16.01.2003 Original published format: IT RE20030001 | [2004/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1443209 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1443209 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | [2005/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F04B1/04 | [2004/32] | CPC: |
F04B1/0413 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/20] |
Former [2004/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wasserpumpe | [2004/32] | English: | Water pump | [2004/32] | French: | Pompe á eau | [2004/32] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/05] | 22.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.05.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 15.05.2006 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB491327 (JOHN MAURICE TOWLER, et al) [X] 1-5,7 * page 3, lines 81-92; figure 1 *; | [X]US3570372 (CAMPBELL JOHN F) [X] 1-3,6,7 * column 2, lines 36-53; figure 2 *; | [X]US3885893 (GLOCK WILFRIED, et al) [X] 1-3,6,7 * column 2, lines 4-14; figure 1 *; | [X]US4997344 (NELSON ROGER J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7 * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 55; figure 1 *; | [A]US5156531 (SCHMID PETER [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4310062 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US6213729 (FASSBENDER AXEL [DE], et al) [A] 1-7* the whole document * |