EP1422167 - Air freshener, holder for deodorant and method for dispensing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/22] | Air freshener | ||
[2010/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter and Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2011/07] |
Former [2004/22] | For all designated states Sara Lee/DE N.V. Keulsekade 143 3532 AA Utrecht / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bulsink, Dirk Jan W. Bladergroenweg 37 2331 BZ Leiden / NL | [2004/22] | Representative(s) | Morelle, Evelyne Charlotte Isabelle, et al N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/07] | Morelle, Evelyne Charlotte Isabelle, et al N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [2004/22] | Prins, Adrianus Willem, Mr. Ir., et al Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 03078704.8 | 24.11.2003 | [2004/22] | Priority number, date | NL20021021979 | 22.11.2002 Original published format: NL 1021979 | [2004/22] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1422167 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1422167 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/16 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
B65D83/267 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/22] | Title | German: | Lufterfrischer, Halterung für Desodorantien und Verfahren zum Abgeben | [2010/51] | English: | Air freshener, holder for deodorant and method for dispensing | [2010/51] | French: | Diffuseur, support de produit désodorisant et procédé de distribution | [2010/51] |
Former [2004/22] | Lufterfrischer | ||
Former [2004/22] | Air freshener | ||
Former [2004/22] | Diffuseur | Examination procedure | 22.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 22.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.05.2011 | BE | 18.05.2011 | CY | 18.05.2011 | CZ | 18.05.2011 | DK | 18.05.2011 | EE | 18.05.2011 | FI | 18.05.2011 | HU | 18.05.2011 | NL | 18.05.2011 | RO | 18.05.2011 | SE | 18.05.2011 | SI | 18.05.2011 | SK | 18.05.2011 | TR | 18.05.2011 | BG | 18.08.2011 | GR | 19.08.2011 | PT | 19.09.2011 | IE | 24.11.2011 | LU | 24.11.2011 | CH | 30.11.2011 | FR | 30.11.2011 | LI | 30.11.2011 | MC | 30.11.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
TR | 18.05.2011 | ||
BG | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
IE | 24.11.2011 | ||
LU | 24.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
BG | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
IE | 24.11.2011 | ||
LU | 24.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
IE | 24.11.2011 | ||
LU | 24.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/04] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
IE | 24.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
IE | 24.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/29] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | PT | 19.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2534465 (MARINI THOMAS O) [A] 1 * column 2, line 25 - column 5, line 59; figures 1-8 *; | [A]DE2141275 (BRENEZ & CIE SOC) [A] * figure 1 *; | [DA]US3858762 (MESHBERG PHILIP) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4428510 (IGLESIAS NEY M [US]) [A] * column 1, line 15 - column 2, line 67 * * column 4, line 11 - line 25; figures 1-10 * | Examination | FR2281172 | by applicant | US3858762 |