EP1434245 - Differential pressure switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2006 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): RO | published on 10.10.2007 [2007/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ma-Ter S.r.l. Via Torricelli, 8 20060 Pessano Con Bornago, (MI) / IT | [2004/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Omati, Marco Gerolamo Via Negroni, 7 20060 Pessano Con Bornago (MI) / IT | 02 /
Omati, Ennio Viale Piave, 46 20060 Pessano Con Bornago (MI) / IT | [2004/27] | Representative(s) | Mittler, Enrico, et al Mittler & C. S.r.l. Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | Mittler, Enrico, et al Mittler & C. s.r.l., Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 03079064.6 | 16.12.2003 | [2004/27] | Priority number, date | IT2002MI02761 | 24.12.2002 Original published format: IT mi20022761 | [2004/27] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1434245 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1434245 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01H35/34 | [2004/27] | CPC: |
H01H35/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/27] | Title | German: | Differentialdruckschalter | [2004/27] | English: | Differential pressure switch | [2004/27] | French: | Commutateur à pression différentielle | [2004/27] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 12.11.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/38] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.10.2005 | BE | 12.10.2005 | CH | 12.10.2005 | CZ | 12.10.2005 | EE | 12.10.2005 | FI | 12.10.2005 | LI | 12.10.2005 | NL | 12.10.2005 | RO | 12.10.2005 | SI | 12.10.2005 | SK | 12.10.2005 | CY | 16.12.2005 | IE | 16.12.2005 | LU | 31.12.2005 | MC | 31.12.2005 | BG | 12.01.2006 | DK | 12.01.2006 | GR | 12.01.2006 | SE | 12.01.2006 | PT | 13.03.2006 | HU | 13.04.2006 | [2007/41] |
Former [2007/20] | AT | 12.10.2005 | |
BE | 12.10.2005 | ||
CH | 12.10.2005 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2005 | ||
EE | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
LI | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SK | 12.10.2005 | ||
CY | 16.12.2005 | ||
IE | 16.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
BG | 12.01.2006 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
HU | 13.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | AT | 12.10.2005 | |
BE | 12.10.2005 | ||
CH | 12.10.2005 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2005 | ||
EE | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
LI | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SK | 12.10.2005 | ||
IE | 16.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
BG | 12.01.2006 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
HU | 13.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 12.10.2005 | |
BE | 12.10.2005 | ||
CH | 12.10.2005 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2005 | ||
EE | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
LI | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SK | 12.10.2005 | ||
IE | 16.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
BG | 12.01.2006 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 12.10.2005 | |
BE | 12.10.2005 | ||
CH | 12.10.2005 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
LI | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SK | 12.10.2005 | ||
IE | 16.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
BG | 12.01.2006 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 12.10.2005 | |
BE | 12.10.2005 | ||
CH | 12.10.2005 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
LI | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SK | 12.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
BG | 12.01.2006 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 12.10.2005 | |
BE | 12.10.2005 | ||
CH | 12.10.2005 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
LI | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SK | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 12.10.2005 | |
BE | 12.10.2005 | ||
CH | 12.10.2005 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
LI | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SK | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 12.10.2005 | |
CH | 12.10.2005 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
LI | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SK | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 12.10.2005 | |
CH | 12.10.2005 | ||
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
LI | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 12.10.2005 | |
FI | 12.10.2005 | ||
LI | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | NL | 12.10.2005 | |
SI | 12.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | SI | 12.10.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3207868 (KUHN CLARENCE W, et al) [X] 1-3 * column 5, lines 48-53; figure 3 *; | [X]US3281554 (BOWMAN GEORGE S) [X] 1 * figure 5 *; | [A]US4914264 (EVERETT CHARLES J [US]) [A] 1-4* the whole document * |