EP1362848 - Process for the preparation of vitamin D derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Schering Pharma Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | [2007/19] |
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states Bayer Schering Pharma AG Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2003/47] | For all designated states Schering Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steinmeyer, Andreas Seeburger Str. 6 13581 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Schwarz, Katica Kaiser-Friedrich-Str. 1 10585 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Giesen, Claudia Hakenfelder Str. 8C 13587 Berlin / DE | 04 /
Haberey, Martin Steinstr. 1 12169 Berlin / DE | 05 /
Fähnrich, Marianne Wrangelstr. 79 10997 Berlin / DE | [2008/29] |
Former [2003/47] | 01 /
Steinmeyer, Andreas Seeburger Str. 6 13581 Berlin / DE | ||
02 /
Schwarz, Katica Kaiser-Friedrich-Atr. 1 10585 Berlin / DE | |||
03 /
Giesen, Claudia Hakenfelder Str. 8C 13587 Berlin / DE | |||
04 /
Haberey, Martin Steinstr. 1 12169 Berlin / DE | |||
05 /
Fähnrich, Marianne Wrangelstr. 79 10997 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | Jungblut, Bernhard Jakob, et al Jungblut & Seuss Patentanwälte Wittestraße 30 J 13509 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/05] | Jungblut, Bernhard Jakob, et al JUNGBLUT & SEUSS Patentanwälte Max-Dohrn-Strasse 10 10589 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2005/25] | Jungblut, Bernhard Jakob, Dr, et al Albrecht, Lüke & Jungblut Patentanwälte Gelfertstrasse 56 14195 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 03090212.6 | 24.07.2000 | [2003/47] | Priority number, date | DE19991035771 | 23.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19935771 | [2003/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1362848 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07C401/00 | [2003/47] | CPC: |
C07D333/16 (EP,US);
C07C401/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P3/14 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
B21C25/02 (EP,US);
B21C25/10 (EP,US);
C07D235/12 (EP,US);
C07D263/32 (EP,US);
C07D277/24 (EP,US);
C07D307/80 (EP,US);
C07D333/22 (EP,US);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/47] | Extension states | LT | 14.07.2003 | LV | 14.07.2003 | RO | 14.07.2003 | SI | 14.07.2003 | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Vitamin D Derivaten | [2003/47] | English: | Process for the preparation of vitamin D derivatives | [2003/47] | French: | Procédé de préparation de dérivés de la vitamine D | [2003/47] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/47] | 08.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 19.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/18] | 09.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/18] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00962278.8 / EP1210327 | Request for further processing for: | 30.05.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 30.05.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.06.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0717034 (DUPHAR INT RES [NL]) [A] 1 * page 5 *; | [A]WO9741096 (SCHERING AG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0854138 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 35 - line 45 *; | [A]WO9847866 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0927721 (SCHERING AG [DE]) [A] 1* claim 1 *; | [X] - HATAKEYAMA, S. ET AL., "A Novel Convergent Synthesis of (+)-1alpha,25-Dihyroxyvitamin D3 Using a Chromium(II)-Mediated Coupling Reaction", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1991), vol. 56, no. 1, pages 461 - 463, XP000973200 [X] 2 * page 462; figure I; example 10 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00001a092 | [X] - DURAISAMY, M. & WALBORSKY, H.M., "Circular Dichroism of Isomeric 10-19-Dihydrovitamin D1", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1983), vol. 105, no. 10, pages 3270 - 3273, XP000973256 [X] 2 * page 3271, column 1, line 8 - line 9; figure II; examples 11,12 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00348a050 | [PX] - DODO, K. ET AL., "Synthesis of a Novel Class of cdc25A Inhibitors from Vitamin D3", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (2000), vol. 10, no. 7, pages 615 - 617, XP004191838 [PX] 2 * page 616; figure 1; example 3A * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(00)00065-2 |