EP1395017 - Method for providing data indicating presence [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2005 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roelands, Marc Armand Segerslei 132/3 2640 Mortsel / BE | [2004/10] | Application number, filing date | 03090219.1 | 16.07.2003 | [2004/10] | Priority number, date | DE2002141092 | 02.09.2002 Original published format: DE 10241092 | [2004/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1395017 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L12/58 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
H04L67/303 (EP,US);
H04L67/306 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04M3/42 (EP,US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US);
H04M3/42093 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | [2004/48] |
Former [2004/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Bereitstellen von Präsenzanzeigedaten | [2004/10] | English: | Method for providing data indicating presence | [2004/10] | French: | Méthode de mise à disposition de données d'indication de presence | [2004/10] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/23] | 30.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.10.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.10.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.10.2004 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1071295 (PHONE COM INC [US]) [X] 1-13 * column A * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0070] * * figures 2A,2B,2C,3B,3C,4A,4C,4D,7A * * claims 1-4,6,9-12 *; | [X]WO0243351 (AT & T WIRELESS SERVICES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * page 1, line 22 - page 3, line 4 * * page 3, line 9 * * page 4, line 11 - line 12 * * page 4, line 17 - page 5, line 27 * * page 6, line 23 - page 7, line 24 * * page 9, line 21 - page 15, line 13 * * figures 2A,12 * * claim 1 *; | [PX]DE10237093 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [PX] 1-8 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0034] ** figure 3 *; | [X] - ETSI, ETSI TS 122 141 V5.2.0 Universal Mobile Telecommuncations System (UMTS); Presence service; Stage 1 (3GPP TS 22.141 version 5.2.0 Release 5), INTERNAL DATABASE PDDOCSERV, ETSI, (200203), XP002262064 [X] 1-13 * page 5 * * page 7 - page 19 * * figures 1-4 * |