EP1408676 - Mobile terminal apparatus, mobile terminal settings changing system, method used therefor, and program thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2007 | Refusal of application | published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/16] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hasegawa, Yuka c/o Nec Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2004/16] | Representative(s) | Wenzel & Kalkoff Patentanwälte Meiendorfer Strasse 89 22145 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/16] | Patentanwälte Wenzel & Kalkoff Grubesallee 26 22143 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03090337.1 | 08.10.2003 | [2004/16] | Priority number, date | JP20020295529 | 09.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002295529 | [2004/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1408676 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/725 | [2004/16] | CPC: |
H04W48/04 (EP,US);
H04M1/72463 (EP,US);
H04M1/663 (EP,US);
H04M1/72457 (EP,US);
H04W8/245 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/01] |
Former [2004/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mobiles Endgerät, System zur Veränderung der Geräteparameter eines mobilen Endgeräts, Methode dafür und Programm dafür | [2004/16] | English: | Mobile terminal apparatus, mobile terminal settings changing system, method used therefor, and program thereof | [2004/16] | French: | Dispositif terminal mobile, système de reglage de parametres de fonctionnement d'un terminal mobile, procédé associé et programme associé | [2004/16] | Examination procedure | 07.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 08.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 13.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/30] | 12.03.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.03.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2003179683 ; | [XY]US2002028674 (SLETTENGREN SVEN KONRAD [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-9,12-15,18,19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0008] - [0027] - [0040] - [0049] - [0055] - [0074] - [0075] * [Y] 4,10,16; | [Y]US2002065070 (NAIKI TAKASHI [JP]) [Y] 4,10,16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0014] , [0015] , [0055] , [0059] *; | [XY]EP1217792 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,7-9,13-15,19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0028] , [0062] , [0104] - [0134] * [Y] 4,10,16; | [Y]US2002082002 (FUJII KENICHI [JP]) [Y] 5,11,17 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0005] , [0032] - [0036] - [0043] - [0051] - [0057] - [0059]; figures 1-14 *; | [Y]US2003109246 (SHIMIZU HIROSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 5,11,17* paragraph [0088]; figures 7a,b,c * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031008), vol. 2003, no. 10, & JP2003179683 A 20030627 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 5,11,17 * abstract * |