EP1420492 - Casing for gas-insulated switchgear [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/21] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seubert, Ingo Fritschestr. 29 10585 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Tautz, Andre Dachsstr. 01 16565 Lehnitz / DE | [2004/21] | Application number, filing date | 03090351.2 | 16.10.2003 | [2004/21] | Priority number, date | DE2002154385 | 18.11.2002 Original published format: DE 10254385 | [2004/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1420492 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1420492 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H02B13/045, H02B13/035 | [2004/21] | CPC: |
H02B13/0356 (EP);
H02B13/045 (EP);
H02G5/063 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI [2006/10] |
Former [2004/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gehäuse einer druckgasisolierten Baugruppe für eine elektrische Anlage | [2004/21] | English: | Casing for gas-insulated switchgear | [2004/21] | French: | Enveloppe pour installation électrique à isolation gazeuse | [2004/21] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/03] | 08.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/09] | 10.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4320337 (HARTMANN HANS, et al) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0718857 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE29620437U (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-10* the whole document *; | [Y]FR2792452 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0718857 | FR2792452 |