EP1431995 - Circuit breaker [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2005 [2005/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dahl, Jörg-Uwe Am Plötzhorn 45 14542 Werder / DE | 02 /
Kruschke, Michael Buchenweg Nr. 12 16727 Schwante / DE | 03 /
Käding, Andreas Rathenaustr. 49 14612 Falkensee / DE | 04 /
Liebetruth, Marc Hubertusallee 60 16548 Glienicke / DE | 05 /
Schmidt, Detlev Richardstr. 61 12055 Berlin / DE | [2004/26] | Application number, filing date | 03090425.4 | 05.12.2003 | [2004/26] | Priority number, date | DE2002161855 | 20.12.2002 Original published format: DE 10261855 | [2004/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1431995 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01H9/56 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
H01H9/563 (EP,US);
H01H1/226 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2005/11] |
Former [2004/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Leistungsschalter | [2004/26] | English: | Circuit breaker | [2004/26] | French: | Disjoncteur | [2004/26] | Examination procedure | 24.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/38] | 19.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 31.01.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 31.01.2005 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19524636 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-13 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]DE19525286 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,12* abstract * |