Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
09.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] |
01.06.2007 | (Expected) grant | published on 04.07.2007 [2007/27] |
05.04.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.09.2006 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
09.09.2006 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
13.05.2006 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
06.04.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
26.10.2005 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
05.10.2005 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | |
12.08.2005 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
17.06.2005 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit | |
22.04.2005 | First examination report | |
19.04.2005 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
04.04.2005 | New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
01.04.2005 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.04.2005 | Definitive list of designations | published on 18.05.2005 [2005/20] |
11.03.2005 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.04.2005 [2005/17] |
16.07.2004 | Publication of search report | published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] |
16.07.2004 | Change - classification | published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] |
10.07.2004 | Change - representative | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] |
29.08.2003 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.10.2003 [2003/42] |