EP1353373 - Hermetically sealed package for an electronic component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M/A-COM, INC. 1011 Pawtuckett Boulevard Lowell, MA 01854 / US | [2003/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goodrich, Joel Lee 25 Pleasant Street 01886, Westford / US | 02 /
Boles, Timothy Edward 18 Hillcrest Drive 01879, Tyngsboro / US | [2003/42] | Representative(s) | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/35] | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron & Warren, 19 South End, Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | ||
Former [2003/42] | Lambrinos, Matthew Franklin, et al Baron & Warren, 19 South End, Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 03100819.6 | 28.03.2003 | [2003/42] | Priority number, date | US20020109351 | 28.03.2002 Original published format: US 109351 | [2003/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1353373 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1353373 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | [2004/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1353373 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/10, H01L21/50 | [2004/36] | CPC: |
B81B7/007 (EP,US);
B81B7/0006 (EP,US);
H01L21/50 (EP,US);
H01L23/10 (EP,US);
H01L2224/451 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
H01L24/45 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/10253 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12032 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12034 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1461 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15311 (EP,US);
H01L2924/16152 (EP,US);
H01L2924/16195 (EP,US);
H01L2924/19041 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/451, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (EP,US);
H01L2924/10253, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/12032, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/12034, H01L2924/00 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2003/42] | H01L23/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/20] |
Former [2003/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hermetisch dichtes Gehäuse für ein elektronisches Bauelement | [2003/42] | English: | Hermetically sealed package for an electronic component | [2003/42] | French: | Boîtier hermétique pour dispositif électronique | [2003/42] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/17] | 01.03.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.04.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2132411 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,5-10,14-16,19,20,25-34 * abstract * * page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 22; table 1 * * page 4, lines 5-12 * * page 4, line 48 - page 5, line 31 * [Y] 2-4,18,21-32,35-41; | [XY]US5286926 (KIMURA YUKIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,5,6,13,16,20,33,34 * abstract * * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 55; claims 1,12-16 * [Y] 2-4,18,21-32,35-41; | [A]US5311402 (KOBAYASHI KENZI [JP], et al) [A] 1-41 * abstract * * column 3, line 55 - column 5, line 50 *; | [XY]US5375042 (ARIMA HIDEO [JP], et al) [X] 1,5-7,9-14,16,20,25-34 * abstract * * column 7, line 61 - column 8, line 29 * [Y] 2-4,18,21-32,35-41; | [A]US5475567 (HEARN JOHN A [US]) [A] 1-41 * abstract * * column 4, line 30 - column 8, line 23 *; | [A]US5949654 (FUKUOKA YOSHITAKA [JP]) [A] 1-41 * abstract * * column 15, line 22 - column 17, line 36 *; | [A]US6225694 (TERUI MAKOTO [JP]) [A] 1-41 * abstract ** column 1, line 65 - column 3, line 26 *; | [Y]WO0156921 (RAYTHEON CO [US]) [Y] 18,22-24,37-41 * abstract * * page 1, lines 16-19 * * page 2, lines 10-13 * * page 3, line 15 - page 4, line 4 * * page 9, line 14 - page 13, line 10 *; | [Y]EP1176641 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 2-4,21-32,35,36 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0029] - [0040] - [0045] , [0046] , [0058]; claims 1-16 * |