EP1357572 - Oxide Cathode for an electron gun, having a denser and thinner emissive zone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.09.2007 [2007/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2003/44] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing S.A. 46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ricaud, Jean-Luc 36, rue Charles Dumont 21000, Dijon / FR | 02 /
Proudhon, Gérard 7 rue Nicéphore Niepce 21800, CHEVIGNY SAINT SAUVEUR / FR | [2003/44] | Representative(s) | Browaeys, Jean-Philippe TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | Browaeys, Jean-Philippe Thomson 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2003/44] | Browaeys, Jean-Philippe Thomson multimedia European Patents Operations 46, quai Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 03101008.5 | 14.04.2003 | [2003/44] | Priority number, date | FR20020005183 | 25.04.2002 Original published format: FR 0205183 | [2003/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1357572 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01J1/142 | [2003/44] | CPC: |
H01J1/142 (EP,US);
H01J1/13 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/30] |
Former [2003/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Oxidkathode für eine Elektronenkanone mit einer dichteren und weniger dicken emittierende Zone | [2003/44] | English: | Oxide Cathode for an electron gun, having a denser and thinner emissive zone | [2003/44] | French: | cathode à oxyde pour canon à electrons à zone emissive plus dense et moins epaisse | [2003/44] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/26] | 09.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/37] | 27.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0915492 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,9-12 * figure 9; claims 1-13,28-33 *; | [A]US6351061 (YAMAUCHI MASAHIDE [JP], et al) [A] 1* claims 1-7 * |