EP1447293 - A Braking Assembly and Method for a Motor Vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2007 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.03.2007 [2007/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FORD MOTOR COMPANY Suite 911, Parklane Towers East, One Parklane Boulevard Dearborn, MI 48125 / US | [2006/15] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states Ford Motor Company Suite 911, Parklane Towers East, One Parklane Boulevard Dearborn, MI 48125 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Crombez, Dale, Scott 9615 Ingram Livonia, MI 48150 / US | [2006/15] |
Former [2004/34] | 01 /
Crombez, Dale, Scott 9615 Ingram 48150, Livonia / US | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al A. Messulam & Co. Ltd., 43-45 High Road Bushey Heath, Bushey, Herts WD23 1EE / GB | Application number, filing date | 03101601.7 | 03.06.2003 | [2004/34] | Priority number, date | US20020064198 | 20.06.2002 Original published format: US 64198 | [2004/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1447293 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1447293 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/00 | [2004/34] | CPC: |
B60T13/586 (EP,US);
B60K6/48 (EP,US);
B60L15/2009 (EP,US);
B60L50/16 (EP,US);
B60L58/15 (EP,US);
B60L7/12 (EP,US);
B60L7/26 (EP,US);
B60T1/10 (EP,US);
B60T8/17616 (EP,US);
B60T8/1766 (EP,US);
B60W10/18 (EP,US);
B60W10/184 (EP,US);
B60L2240/423 (EP,US);
B60L2240/425 (EP,US);
B60L2240/545 (EP,US);
B60L2250/26 (EP,US);
B60T2270/604 (EP,US);
B60T2270/608 (EP,US);
B60W2720/403 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US);
Y02T10/72 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/19] |
Former [2004/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bremssystem und Bremsverfahren für ein Motorfahrzeug | [2004/34] | English: | A Braking Assembly and Method for a Motor Vehicle | [2004/34] | French: | Système et méthode à freinage d'un véhicule motorisé | [2004/34] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/10] | 10.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US5967621 (ITO HISAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7 * abstract * [A] 9,10 [Y] 3-5,8; | [Y]US2002163251 (CROMBEZ DALE SCOTT [US], et al) [Y] 3-5,8* abstract * |