EP1376638 - Electromagnetic protection and control assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 35, rue Joseph Monier 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 35 rue Joseph Monier 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | ||
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 35 Rue Joseph Monier 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | ||
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 89, boulevard Franklin Roosevelt 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Garcia, José 23 rue de la Croix de Molphey 21410, Agey / FR | 02 /
Paggi, Serge 21, rue du Fontenis 21490, Ruffey Les Echirey / FR | 03 /
Perrocheau, Régis 2 rue Jean de Thenissey 21560, Couternon / FR | [2004/01] | Application number, filing date | 03101682.7 | 10.06.2003 | [2004/01] | Priority number, date | FR20020007963 | 25.06.2002 Original published format: FR 0207963 | [2004/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1376638 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1376638 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01H71/08, H01R9/24 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
H01H71/082 (EP,US);
H01H50/04 (KR);
H01R9/2458 (EP,US);
H01H2011/0037 (EP,US);
H01R13/514 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, SE [2004/39] |
Former [2004/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektromagnetischer Schutz und Steuereinheit | [2013/11] | English: | Electromagnetic protection and control assembly | [2004/01] | French: | Ensemble de protection et de commande électromagnétique | [2004/01] |
Former [2004/01] | Elektromagnetischer Schütz und Steuereinheit | Examination procedure | 21.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/13] | 28.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE8434232U (SIEMENS) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0588712 (TELEMECANIQUE [FR]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]EP1014414 (SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC IND SA [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [AD]EP1100105 (SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC IND SA [FR]) [AD] 1 * the whole document * |