EP1382885 - Method for re-engaging a dual power path drive for a rotating threshing rotor of an agricultural combine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CNH Belgium N.V. Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [2004/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ho, Yun Ren 1436 Chelsea Lane IL-60565, Naperville / US | 02 /
McKee, Kevin D. 1116 Barcroft Court IL-60540, Naperville / US | 03 /
Bundy, John 4025 Wickford Place WI-53405, Racine / US | 04 /
Brome, John G. 1420 Birchwood Street WI-53115, Delavan / US | [2004/04] | Representative(s) | CNH Industrial IP Department CNH Belgium NV Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/04] | CNH IP Department c/o CNH Belgium NV Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | Application number, filing date | 03102158.7 | 15.07.2003 | [2004/04] | Priority number, date | US20020199863 | 19.07.2002 Original published format: US 199863 | US20020199681 | 19.07.2002 Original published format: US 199681 | [2004/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1382885 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1382885 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16H47/04, A01D41/127 | [2004/04] | CPC: |
F16H47/04 (EP);
A01D41/1274 (EP);
B60K17/28 (EP);
F16H2037/088 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren um einen Zweiwegeeantrieb für eine Mähdrescherdreschtrommel wiedereinzukuppeln | [2004/04] | English: | Method for re-engaging a dual power path drive for a rotating threshing rotor of an agricultural combine | [2004/04] | French: | Méthode pour le réengagement d'une transmission à double source de puissance pour le tambour de battage d'une moissonneuse-batteuse | [2004/04] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 09.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.12.2006 | BE | 13.12.2006 | CH | 13.12.2006 | CY | 13.12.2006 | CZ | 13.12.2006 | EE | 13.12.2006 | FI | 13.12.2006 | LI | 13.12.2006 | NL | 13.12.2006 | RO | 13.12.2006 | SI | 13.12.2006 | SK | 13.12.2006 | TR | 13.12.2006 | BG | 13.03.2007 | SE | 13.03.2007 | GR | 14.03.2007 | ES | 24.03.2007 | PT | 14.05.2007 | HU | 14.06.2007 | LU | 15.07.2007 | IE | 16.07.2007 | MC | 31.07.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
BE | 13.12.2006 | ||
CH | 13.12.2006 | ||
CY | 13.12.2006 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2006 | ||
EE | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
LI | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
RO | 13.12.2006 | ||
SI | 13.12.2006 | ||
SK | 13.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
GR | 14.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
LU | 15.07.2007 | ||
IE | 16.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
BE | 13.12.2006 | ||
CH | 13.12.2006 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2006 | ||
EE | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
LI | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
RO | 13.12.2006 | ||
SI | 13.12.2006 | ||
SK | 13.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
GR | 14.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
IE | 16.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
BE | 13.12.2006 | ||
CH | 13.12.2006 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
LI | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
RO | 13.12.2006 | ||
SI | 13.12.2006 | ||
SK | 13.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
GR | 14.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
IE | 16.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
BE | 13.12.2006 | ||
CH | 13.12.2006 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
LI | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
RO | 13.12.2006 | ||
SI | 13.12.2006 | ||
SK | 13.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
GR | 14.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
BE | 13.12.2006 | ||
CH | 13.12.2006 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
LI | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
RO | 13.12.2006 | ||
SI | 13.12.2006 | ||
SK | 13.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
BE | 13.12.2006 | ||
CH | 13.12.2006 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
LI | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
RO | 13.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
BE | 13.12.2006 | ||
CH | 13.12.2006 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
LI | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
BE | 13.12.2006 | ||
CH | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
LI | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 13.12.2006 | |
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5865700 (HORSCH JOACHIM [US]) [X] 1-3,7,10-12,14-16 * column 3, line 8 - column 4, line 65 * * claim 15 * * figures 1,3 *; | [A]US5947818 (SATZLER RONNIE L [US]) [A] 1,14-16 * column 2, line 18 - column 4, line 6 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US6059656 (SATZLER RONNIE L [US]) [A] 1,14-16 * column 2, line 48 - column 4, line 52 ** figures 1,2 *; | [XA]EP1072817 (FORD NEW HOLLAND NV [BE]) [X] 1-5,7,10-16 * column 5, line 17 - column 7, line 9 * * column 7, line 52 - column 9, line 36 * * column 9, line 50 - column 10, line 8 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 6,8 |