Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005014603 | Global Dossier | 20.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19968102 | 19.07.2002 | US91666304 | 12.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6984171 | 10.01.2006 | B2 | US2004014509 | 22.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19968102 | 19.07.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6726560 | 27.04.2004 | B2 | US2004018864 | 29.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19986302 | 19.07.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1382885 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2006 | B1 | EP1382885 | 21.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19986302 | 19.07.2002 | US19968102 | 19.07.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE348277T | 15.01.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US19986302 | 19.07.2002 | US19968102 | 19.07.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60310317T | 24.05.2007 | T2 | DE60310317D1 | 25.01.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US19986302 | 19.07.2002 | US19968102 | 19.07.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1382885T | 30.04.2007 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US19986302 | 19.07.2002 | US19968102 | 19.07.2002 |