EP1388438 - A Method and System for Monitoring Tyre Pressure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2009 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC Fairlane Plaza South Suite 800 330 Town Center Drive Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC Fairlane Plaza South Suite 800 330 Town Center Drive Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | ||
Former [2006/20] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC. Fairlane Plaza South Suite 800 330 Town Center Drive Dearborn MI 48126 / US | ||
Former [2004/07] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC Suite 600, Parklane Towers East, One Parklane Boulevard Dearborn, Michigan 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bennie, Brian 14091, Mercilane Drive 48313, Sterling heights / US | 02 /
Porter, Frederick, James 29113, Forest Hill Drive 48331, Farmington Hills / US | 03 /
Shah, Leena 611 North Fox Hills Drive 48304, Bloomfield Township / US | 04 /
McQuade, Thomas, Michael 2615, Lone Oak 48103, Ann Arbor / US | 05 /
Miller, Thomas, Lee 1399, Fieldstone Court 48108, Ann Arbor / US | [2004/07] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/07] | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al A. Messulam & Co. Ltd., 43-45 High Road Bushey Heath, Bushey, Herts WD23 1EE / GB | Application number, filing date | 03102389.8 | 31.07.2003 | [2004/07] | Priority number, date | US20020064694 | 07.08.2002 Original published format: US 64694 | [2004/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1388438 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1388438 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | [2006/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1388438 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60C23/04 | [2004/07] | CPC: |
B60C23/0416 (EP,US);
B60C23/0401 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [2006/40] |
Former [2004/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Reifendrucküberwachung | [2004/07] | English: | A Method and System for Monitoring Tyre Pressure | [2004/07] | French: | Méthode et système pour la surveillance de pression des pneumatiques | [2004/07] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 28.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0671289 (DELCO ELECTRONICS CORP [US]) [X] 1,6,7,9,10 * column 7 - column 8 * * figures 1-5,7,8 *; | [A]US6232875 (DEZORZI TIMOTHY [US]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1,2,6,8 *; | [A]WO0181104 (SCHRADER BRIDGEPORT INT INC [US], et al) [A] 10 * page 16 - page 18 ** figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP1197356 (TRW INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0047] * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2002044050 (DERBYSHIRE ANDREW JOHN [GB], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0135] * |