EP1376460 - Chip card [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2007/31] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berger, Dominik Josef c/o Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH 52088, Aachen / DE | 02 /
Eber, Wolfgang c/o Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH 52088, Aachen / DE | 03 /
Holweg, Gerald c/o Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH 52088, Aachen / DE | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Meyer, Michael Josef, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | Meyer, Michael Josef, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03102645.3 | 30.05.1996 | [2004/01] | Priority number, date | AT19950000947 | 02.06.1995 Original published format: AT 94795 | [2004/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1376460 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1376460 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/07 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
G06K19/07769 (EP,US);
G06K19/07 (EP,US);
G06K19/0723 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [2004/01] | Title | German: | Chipkarte | [2004/01] | English: | Chip card | [2004/01] | French: | Carte à puce | [2004/01] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 23.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96913696.9 / EP0774144 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.05.2008 | [2009/40] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS61143890 ; | [DX]DE3935364 (H.D.KREFT) [DX] 1,2 * /* das ganze Dokument */ *; | [A]GB2245725 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO9309551 (STOWASSER HERBERT [DE]) [A] 1,2* page 3, line 20 - line 24; claim 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861118), vol. 010, no. 341, Database accession no. (P - 517), & JP61143890 A 19860701 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |