EP1403424 - Headbox with guide vane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Str. 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states Voith Paper Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Henssler, Joachim Franz-Joachim-Beich-Str. 19 88213 Ravensburg / DE | 02 /
Prössl, Jürgen Happenweiler 402 88263 Horgenzell / DE | 03 /
Schwaner, Mathias Bischof-Sproll-Weg 9 88212 Ravensburg / DE | 04 /
Ruf, Wolfgang Wedelstr. 3/2 89542 Herbrechtingen / DE | 05 /
Wischmann, Ralf Gartenstr. 18 88368 Bergatreute / DE | [2007/18] |
Former [2004/14] | 01 /
Henssler, Joachim Franz-Joachim-Beich-Str. 19 88213, Ravensburg / DE | ||
02 /
Prössl, Jürgen Happenweiler 420 88263, Horgenzell / DE | |||
03 /
Schwaner, Mathias Bischof-Sproll-Weg 9 88212, Ravensburg / DE | |||
04 /
Ruf, Wolfgang Wedelstr. 3/2 89542, Herbrechtingen / DE | |||
05 /
Wischmann, Ralf Gartenstr. 18 88368, Bergatreute / DE | Representative(s) | Kunze, Klaus, et al Voith Paper Holding GmbH & Co. KG Abteilung zjp Sankt Poeltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | Kunze, Klaus, et al Voith Paper Holding GmbH & Co. KG Abteilung zjp Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 03102713.9 | 05.09.2003 | [2004/14] | Priority number, date | DE2002145156 | 27.09.2002 Original published format: DE 10245156 | [2004/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1403424 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1403424 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | D21F1/02 | [2004/14] | CPC: |
D21F1/028 (EP);
D21F1/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/14] | Title | German: | Stoffauflauf mit Leitschaufel | [2004/14] | English: | Headbox with guide vane | [2004/14] | French: | Caisse de tête avec aube de guidage | [2004/14] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 30.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.11.2007 | CZ | 14.11.2007 | DK | 14.11.2007 | EE | 14.11.2007 | GB | 14.11.2007 | IE | 14.11.2007 | NL | 14.11.2007 | RO | 14.11.2007 | SI | 14.11.2007 | SK | 14.11.2007 | TR | 14.11.2007 | BG | 14.02.2008 | GR | 15.02.2008 | ES | 25.02.2008 | PT | 14.04.2008 | HU | 15.05.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/34] | CY | 14.11.2007 | |
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
GB | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
HU | 15.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 14.11.2007 | |
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
GB | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
GB | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
GB | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/03] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
GB | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CZ | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | NL | 14.11.2007 | |
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | NL | 14.11.2007 | |
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4298429 (HERGERT RICHARD E, et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 1, lines 62-68 * * column 3, lines 10-48 * * column 4, lines 49-68 * * figure - *; | [X]EP0211607 (SEISHI GIJUTSU KENKYU KUMIAI [JP]) [X] 1,3-5,9,11-13,15,16,19,23,25,27-29 * page 5, line 10 - page 7, line 18 * * figure - *; | [AD]DE10150951 (VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] , [0048] ** figure - * |