EP1407808 - Method for producing a biomimetic membrane, biomimetic membrane and uses thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 25, rue Leblanc Immeuble "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | [2006/44] |
Former [2004/16] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31-33, rue de la Fédération 75752 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fuchs, Alexandra 2, rue Saint-Robert 38120 Saint-Egrève / FR | 02 /
Heitzmann, Michel 44, Impasse des Noyers Cidex 124 F 38920 Crolles / FR | 03 /
Vinet, Françoise 22, boulevard Edouard Rey 38000 Grenoble / FR | [2007/51] |
Former [2004/16] | 01 /
Fuchs, Alexandra 2, rue Saint-Robert 38120 Saint-Egrève / FR | ||
02 /
Heitzmann, Michel 44, Impasse des Noyers Cedex 124 F 38920 Crolles / FR | |||
03 /
Vinet, Françoise 22, boulevard Edouard Rey 38000 Grenoble / FR | Representative(s) | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Brevatome 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2004/16] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Société BREVATOME 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 03103493.7 | 22.09.2003 | [2004/16] | Priority number, date | FR20020011770 | 24.09.2002 Original published format: FR 0211770 | [2004/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1407808 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B01D67/00, G03F7/00, B81B1/00, B01D69/02, B01D71/02 | [2004/16] | CPC: |
B01D67/0062 (EP,US);
B01D63/088 (EP,US);
B81C1/00158 (EP,US);
B81B2203/0127 (EP,US);
B81B2203/0353 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer biomimetischen Membran, biomimetische Membran und ihre Anwendungen | [2004/16] | English: | Method for producing a biomimetic membrane, biomimetic membrane and uses thereof | [2004/16] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une membrane biomimetique, membrane biomimetique et ses applications | [2004/16] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/47] | 23.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/39] | 08.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5753014 (VAN RIJN CORNELIS JOHANNES MAR [NL]) [A] 1,17 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US5919364 (LEBOUITZ KYLE S [US], et al) [A] 1,17 * figure -; claim - *; | [AD]WO0136321 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [AD] 1-29 * figure -; claim - *; | [AP]US6478974 (LEBOUITZ KYLE S [US], et al) [AP] 1-16* figure -; claim - *; | [A] - T.A.DESAI ET AL, "characterization of micromachined silicon membranes for immunoisolation and bioseparation applications", JOURNAL OF MEMBRANE SCIENCE, amsterdam,nl, (1999), vol. 159, page 221-231, XP004169176 [A] 1-29 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0376-7388(99)00062-9 |